Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0975735

EP0975735 - DETERGENT COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  31.10.2003
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip04.07.2008Change - applicantpublished on 06.08.2008  [2008/32]
Applicant(s)For:GB  IE 
Unilever PLC
Unilever House
Blackfriars
London
Greater London EC4P 4BQ / GB
For:BE  DE  ES  FR  IT  NL 
Unilever N.V.
Weena 455
3013 AL Rotterdam / NL
[N/P]
Former [2008/32]For:GB  IE 
Unilever PLC
Unilever House Blackfriars London
EC4P 4BQ / GB
For:BE  DE  ES  FR  IT  NL 
UNILEVER N.V.
Weena 455
3013 AL Rotterdam / NL
Former [2000/05]For:GB  IE 
UNILEVER PLC
Unilever House Blackfriars P.O. Box 68
London EC4P 4BQ / GB
For:BE  DE  ES  FR  IT  NL 
UNILEVER N.V.
Weena 455
3013 AL Rotterdam / NL
Inventor(s)01 / ADAMS, Michael, John, Unilever Research
Quarry Road East, Bebington
Wirral, Merseyside L63 3JW / GB
02 / BONNELL, Sara, Jane
1 Broadmead, Southwood
Farnborough, Hampshire GU14 0RJ / GB
03 / WATSON, Simon, Andrew, Unilever Research
Quarry Road East, Bebington
Wirral, Merseyside L63 3JW / GB
04 / WRAIGE, Douglas, Unilever Research
Quarry Road East, Bebington
Wirral, Merseyside L63 3JW / GB
[2000/05]
Representative(s)Hodgetts, Catherine Dawn , et al
Unilever Patent Group
Olivier van Noortlaan 120
3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL
[N/P]
Former [2000/35]Hodgetts, Catherine Dawn , et al
Unilever N.V., Patent Department, P.O. Box 137
3130 AC Vlaardingen / NL
Former [2000/05]Elliott, Peter William , et al
Unilever plc Patent Division Colworth House Sharnbrook
Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB
Application number, filing date98924117.909.04.1998
[2000/05]
WO1998EP02188
Priority number, dateGB1997000761415.04.1997         Original published format: GB 9707614
[2000/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9846719
Date:22.10.1998
Language:EN
[1998/42]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0975735
Date:02.02.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.10.1998
[2000/05]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP22.10.1998
ClassificationInternational:C11D17/00, C11D17/06, B30B15/02
[2000/05]
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IE,   IT,   NL [2000/05]
Extension statesRO30.09.1999
TitleGerman:WASCHMITTELZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN[2000/05]
English:DETERGENT COMPOSITIONS[2000/05]
French:COMPOSITIONS DETERGENTES[2000/05]
Entry into regional phase30.09.1999National basic fee paid 
30.09.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
30.09.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.10.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
30.09.1999Examination requested  [2000/05]
03.02.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.06.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/51]
18.07.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2003/51]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
07.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
22.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
22.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Cited inInternational search[DXA]GB2276345  (UNILEVER PLC [GB]) [DX] 1,7 * page 13, paragraph L - page 14, paragraph 1; claims 2,5,9 * [A] 8-10;
 [A]WO9600278  (UNILEVER PLC [GB], et al) [A] 1,4 * claim 1 *;
 [PX]WO9720028  (UNILEVER PLC [GB], et al) [PX] 1,7,8 * claims 1,4,9,13 *;
 [A]GB2260989  (UNILEVER PLC [GB]) [A] 1,3,7,8 * claims 1,4 *