Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0977497

EP0977497 - METHOD FOR STARTING UP A DOSING APPARATUS FOR LIQUIDS HAVING IN-LINE PROPERTIES, FOR USE PARTICULARLY IN THE MANUFACTURE OF SOFT DRINKS FROM WATER, SYRUP AND CARBON DIOXIDE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  05.04.2002
Database last updated on 14.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip05.04.2002Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 22.05.2002  [2002/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Tuchenhagen GmbH
Am Industriepark 2-10
21514 Büchen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/06]For all designated states
TUCHENHAGEN GmbH
Am Industriepark 2-10
21514 Büchen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / BÖE, Kristina
Zum dicken Busch 18a
D-22885 Barsbüttel / DE
02 / WELCHNER, Karl
Schmiedestrasse 1
D-21514 Büchen / DE
03 / GROSSMANN, Holger
Modersohnstrasse 7
D-21109 Hamburg / DE
04 / HEROLD, Thomas
Wasserkrügerweg 103
D-23879 Mölln / DE
05 / BENDFELDT, Werner
Hohlweg 4
D-23898 Kühsen / DE
[2000/06]
Application number, filing date98924126.016.04.1998
[2000/06]
WO1998EP02230
Priority number, dateDE199711644721.04.1997         Original published format: DE 19716447
DE199810169519.01.1998         Original published format: DE 19801695
[2000/06]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO9847395
Date:29.10.1998
Language:DE
[1998/43]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0977497
Date:09.02.2000
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.10.1998
[2000/06]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP11.02.1999
ClassificationInternational:A23L2/00
[2000/06]
Designated contracting statesBE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [2000/06]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUM ANFAHREN EINER FLÜSSIGKEITS-DOSIERANLAGE MIT IN-LINE-EIGENSCHAFTEN, INSBESONDERE BEI DER HERSTELLUNG VON SOFTDRINKS[2000/06]
English:METHOD FOR STARTING UP A DOSING APPARATUS FOR LIQUIDS HAVING IN-LINE PROPERTIES, FOR USE PARTICULARLY IN THE MANUFACTURE OF SOFT DRINKS FROM WATER, SYRUP AND CARBON DIOXIDE[2000/06]
French:PROCEDE DE MISE EN MARCHE D'UNE INSTALLATION DE DOSAGE DE LIQUIDE A PROPRIETES EN LIGNE, NOTAMMENT DANS LE CADRE DE LA PRODUCTION DE BOISSONS GAZEUSES A BASE D'EAU, DE SIROP ET DE GAZ CARBONIQUE[2000/06]
Entry into regional phase30.07.1999National basic fee paid 
30.07.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
30.07.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.11.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
30.07.1999Examination requested  [2000/06]
01.11.2001Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2002/21]
14.12.2001Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2002/21]
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.200104   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[AD]DE4238971  (TUCHENHAGEN OTTO GMBH [DE]) [AD] 1-10 * figure -; claim - *;
 [A]DE9420518U  (BEHNAM DARIUS [DE], et al) [A] 1-10 * figure -; claim - *;
 [A]WO9617529  (TETRA LAVAL HOLDINGS & FINANCE [CH], et al) [A] 1-10 * figure -; claim - *;
 [PDA]DE19625108  (TUCHENHAGEN OTTO GMBH [DE]) [PDA] 1-10 * figure -; claim - *