EP0973760 - KODAISTATINS A, B, C AND D, A PROCESS FOR THEIR PRODUCTION AND THEIR USE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.09.2003 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.11.2003 [2003/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aventis Pharma Deutschland GmbH Brüningstrasse 50 65929 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [2000/14] |
Former [2000/04] | For all designated states Hoechst Marion Roussel Deutschland GmbH Brüningstrasse 50 65929 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RAMAKRISHNA, Nirogi Venkata Satya E-4/Flat, 303, Highland Park Mulund (W), Mumbai - 400 082 / IN | 02 /
SWAMY, Keshavapura Hosamane Sreedhara B-402, Lok Rachana Amar Nagar Mulund (W), Mumbai - 400 082 / IN | 03 /
VIJAYAKUMAR, Erra Koteswara Satya K-3, Hoechst Qtrs., Amar Nagar Mulund (W), Mumbai - 400 082 / IN | 04 /
NADKARNI, Suresh Rudra 5, Yagneshwar, Kasturba Marg Mulund (W), Mumbai - 400 080 / IN | 05 /
JAYVANTI, Kenia 11, Dev Aashish, Ganesh Gwade Road Mulund (W), Mumbai - 400 080 / IN | 06 /
HERLING, Andreas, W. Am Walberstück 5 D-65520 Bad Camberg / DE | 07 /
KOGLER, Herbert Dattenbachstrasse 12 D-61479 Schlosshorn / DE | 08 /
VERTESY, Laszlo Eppenhainer Weg 6 D-65817 Eppstein / DE | 09 /
PANSHIKAR, Rajan Mukund Everest Bld 31, Bl.11, Pandit Dindayal Cross Lane Dombivali (W), Maharashtra 421202 / IN | 10 /
SRIDEVI, Kota, K.S.R. Murthy 503, Veena Vihar, 17/A, Flank Road Sion Mumbai - 400 022 / IN | 11 /
RAMAN, Mythili G-34, Hoechst Qtrs., Amar Nagar Muland (W), Mumbai - 400 082 / IN | 12 /
DALAL, Roda Maneck G-21, Cusrow Baug, S. Bhagat Singh Road Colaba, Mumbai - 400 001 / IN | [2000/04] | Application number, filing date | 98924129.4 | 17.04.1998 | [2000/04] | WO1998EP02247 | Priority number, date | EP19970106453 | 18.04.1997 Original published format: EP 97106453 | EP19970109900 | 18.06.1997 Original published format: EP 97109900 | EP19970120536 | 24.11.1997 Original published format: EP 97120536 | [2000/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9847888 | Date: | 29.10.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0973760 | Date: | 26.01.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.10.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0973760 | Date: | 13.11.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.10.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C07D307/60, A61K31/00, C12N1/02, C12P7/00, // (C12P7/00, C12R1:66) | [2000/04] | CPC: |
C12P7/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/00 (EP,US);
A61P3/10 (EP);
C07D307/60 (EP,US);
C12N1/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [2000/04] | Title | German: | KODAISTATINE A,B,C UND D, VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG UND VERWENDUNG | [2000/04] | English: | KODAISTATINS A, B, C AND D, A PROCESS FOR THEIR PRODUCTION AND THEIR USE | [2000/04] | French: | CODAISTATINES A, B, C ET D, LEUR PROCEDE DE PREPARATION ET LEUR UTILISATION | [2000/04] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Entry into regional phase | 18.11.1999 | National basic fee paid | 18.11.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.11.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.11.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 18.11.1999 | Examination requested [2000/04] | 30.05.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.09.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.09.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.11.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.01.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.05.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.09.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 09.09.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.08.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [PA]JPH09202797 ; | [AD]EP0587087 (HOECHST AG [DE]) [AD] 1-6,11-13 * claims 1,4 *; | [PA] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 97, no. 41, Database accession no. 97-444091, XP002061463 & JPH09202797 A 19970805 (SANKYO CO LTD) [PA] 7-10,14 * abstract * | Examination | - Database Crossfire [Online], Beilstein Informationssysteme GmbH Beilstein Registry Number 6995227 | - Database Crossfire [Online], Beilstein Informationssysteme GmbH Beilstein Registry Number 5469152 |