Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0980473

EP0980473 - DELIVERY UNIT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.04.2004
Database last updated on 19.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip27.06.2008Change - applicantpublished on 30.07.2008  [2008/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1
DE-80333 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/31]For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
Former [2002/02]For all designated states
Siemens Aktiengesellschaft
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
Former [2000/08]For all designated states
Mannesmann VDO Aktiengesellschaft
Kruppstrasse 105
60388 Frankfurt am Main / DE
Inventor(s)01 / KOHLHAAS, Helmut
Kupferstrasse 25
D-36208 Wildeck-Richelsdorf / DE
02 / WILHELM, Dieter
Blücherstrasse 18
D-36179 Bebra / DE
[2000/08]
Representative(s)(deleted)
...
[2002/20]
Former [2002/06]Berg, Peter
European Patent Attorney, Siemens AG, Postfach 22 16 34
80506 München / DE
Former [2000/08]Rassler, Andrea, Dipl.-Phys.
Kruppstrasse 105
60388 Frankfurt / DE
Application number, filing date98924156.721.04.1998
[2000/08]
WO1998EP02336
Priority number, dateDE199711879203.05.1997         Original published format: DE 19718792
[2000/08]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9850695
Date:12.11.1998
Language:DE
[1998/45]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0980473
Date:23.02.2000
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.11.1998
[2000/08]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0980473
Date:25.06.2003
Language:DE
[2003/26]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP12.11.1998
ClassificationInternational:F02M37/08, F02M37/22
[2000/08]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB [2000/08]
TitleGerman:FÖRDEREINHEIT[2000/08]
English:DELIVERY UNIT[2000/08]
French:UNITE DE REFOULEMENT[2000/08]
Entry into regional phase27.10.1999National basic fee paid 
27.10.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
27.10.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.11.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
27.10.1999Examination requested  [2000/08]
06.09.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.12.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.06.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.11.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.12.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.04.2003Fee for grant paid
07.04.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)26.03.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/25]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
14.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
22.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
17.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Cited inInternational search[XY]US5411376  (FOURNIER KIRK D [US], et al) [X] 1-4 * column 3, line 37 - line 63; figure 1 * [Y] 5;
 [Y]DE4338349  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [Y] 5 * column 1, line 38 - line 50 *;
 [A]US3875059  (MASCHINO DALE C) [A] 1 * figure 4 *;
 [A]DE19513414  (PIERBURG AG [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]GB1033241  (GEN MOTORS LTD [GB]) [A] 1 * figure 1; claim 1 *;
 [A]JPS61171611  ;
 [A]JPH07208291
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19861217), vol. 010, no. 378, Database accession no. (M - 546), & JP61171611 A 19860802 (NISSAN MOTOR CO LTD;OTHERS: 02) [A] 1 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19951226), vol. 095, no. 011, & JP07208291 A 19950808 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [A] 1 * abstract *