Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0984725

EP0984725 - INSTRUMENT FOR RESECTIONING HAEMORRHOIDS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.02.2005
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip14.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 16.04.2008  [2008/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Burgard, Gunther
Fasanenweg 7
66424 Homburg / DE
[2000/11]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[2000/11]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/11]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date98924191.423.04.1998
[2000/11]
WO1998EP02423
Priority number, dateDE199711870802.05.1997         Original published format: DE 19718708
[2000/11]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9849950
Date:12.11.1998
Language:DE
[1998/45]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0984725
Date:15.03.2000
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.11.1998
[2000/11]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0984725
Date:07.04.2004
Language:DE
[2004/15]
Search report(s)International search reportEP12.11.1998
ClassificationInternational:A61B17/32, A61B17/22
[2000/11]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [2000/11]
TitleGerman:HÄMORRHOIDENRESEKTIONSINSTRUMENT[2000/11]
English:INSTRUMENT FOR RESECTIONING HAEMORRHOIDS[2000/11]
French:INSTRUMENT DE RESECTION D'HEMORROIDES[2000/11]
Entry into regional phase21.10.1999National basic fee paid 
21.10.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
21.10.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.12.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
21.10.1999Examination requested  [2000/11]
21.10.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.01.2004Fee for grant paid
29.01.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)10.01.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/13]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
26.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
29.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
29.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR07.04.2004
GB07.04.2004
IT07.04.2004
NL07.04.2004
AT23.04.2004
LU23.04.2004
BE30.04.2004
CH30.04.2004
LI30.04.2004
DK07.07.2004
SE07.07.2004
ES18.07.2004
[2008/16]
Former [2006/14]FR07.04.2004
GB07.04.2004
NL07.04.2004
AT23.04.2004
LU23.04.2004
BE30.04.2004
CH30.04.2004
LI30.04.2004
DK07.07.2004
SE07.07.2004
ES18.07.2004
Former [2006/13]GB07.04.2004
NL07.04.2004
AT23.04.2004
LU23.04.2004
BE30.04.2004
CH30.04.2004
LI30.04.2004
DK07.07.2004
SE07.07.2004
ES18.07.2004
Former [2005/51]GB07.04.2004
AT23.04.2004
LU23.04.2004
BE30.04.2004
CH30.04.2004
LI30.04.2004
DK07.07.2004
SE07.07.2004
ES18.07.2004
Former [2005/28]GB07.04.2004
LU23.04.2004
BE30.04.2004
CH30.04.2004
LI30.04.2004
DK07.07.2004
SE07.07.2004
ES18.07.2004
Former [2005/23]GB07.04.2004
LU23.04.2004
CH30.04.2004
LI30.04.2004
DK07.07.2004
SE07.07.2004
ES18.07.2004
Former [2005/21]GB07.04.2004
CH30.04.2004
LI30.04.2004
DK07.07.2004
SE07.07.2004
ES18.07.2004
Former [2005/18]GB07.04.2004
DK07.07.2004
SE07.07.2004
ES18.07.2004
Former [2005/02]GB07.04.2004
SE07.07.2004
ES18.07.2004
Former [2005/01]GB07.04.2004
SE07.07.2004
Former [2004/52]SE07.07.2004
Cited inInternational search[X]US4428748  (PEYMAN GHOLAM A [US], et al) [X] 1-7,9,20-25 * abstract * * column 2, lines 29-60 * * column 6, lines 18-33 *;
 [X]US5234451  (OSYPKA PETER [DE]) [X] 1,9,28,30 * abstract * * column 3, lines 31-68 * * column 6, lines 3-48 *;
 [DA]EP0688536  (ERBE ELEKTROMEDIZIN [DE]) [DA] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]DE19522310  (KREIS A DR [DE]) [A] 1 * figure -; claim - *;
 [A]WO9407423  (HAKKY SAID I [US], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5084052  (JACOBS RANDALL W [US]) [A] 2-7,20-22 * abstract *;
 [A]US4998527  (MEYER WILLIAM F [US]) [A] * abstract *
by applicantEP0591619
 US4931047
 DE1616003
 EP0688536
 EP0578376
 US3808093
 US3945375
 US3937222