Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0981530

EP0981530 - COMPOUNDS ON THE BASIS OF POLYALKYL-1-OXA-DIAZASPIRODECANE COMPOUNDS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  26.12.2003
Database last updated on 08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip26.12.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 11.02.2004  [2004/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Clariant GmbH
Brüningstrasse 50
65929 Frankfurt am Main / DE
[2000/09]
Inventor(s)01 / STÄHRFELDT, Thomas
Lohwaldstrasse 59
D-86356 Neusä / DE
02 / MEHRER, Mathias
Roseggerstrasse 4
D-86456 Gablingen / DE
03 / ZÄH, Matthias
Langemarckstrasse 88
D-86368 Gersthofen / DE
04 / PFAHLER, Gerhard
Karlsbader Strasse 27
D-86169 Augsburg / DE
[2000/09]
Application number, filing date98924299.511.05.1998
[2000/09]
WO1998EP02738
Priority number, dateDE199711994413.05.1997         Original published format: DE 19719944
[2000/09]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9851690
Date:19.11.1998
Language:DE
[1998/46]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0981530
Date:01.03.2000
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.11.1998
[2000/09]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0981530
Date:19.02.2003
Language:DE
[2003/08]
Search report(s)International search reportEP19.11.1998
ClassificationInternational:C07D519/00, C08G73/06, C08K5/353, C08K5/52, C08K5/15, // (C07D519/00, 498:00, 498:00, 498:00)
[2000/09]
Designated contracting statesBE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [2000/09]
TitleGerman:VERBINDUNGEN AUF BASIS VON POLYALKYL-1-OXA-DIAZASPIRODECAN-VERBINDUNGEN[2000/09]
English:COMPOUNDS ON THE BASIS OF POLYALKYL-1-OXA-DIAZASPIRODECANE COMPOUNDS[2000/09]
French:COMPOSES A BASE DE COMPOSES DE POLYALKYL-1-OXA-DIAZASPIRODECANE[2000/09]
Entry into regional phase13.12.1999National basic fee paid 
13.12.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
13.12.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.10.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
13.12.1999Examination requested  [2000/09]
24.04.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
26.08.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.11.2002Fee for grant paid
26.11.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.11.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2004/07]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
31.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
31.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
23.12.1999ES   M01   Fee paid on   23.12.1999
23.12.1999GB   M01   Fee paid on   23.12.1999
Cited inInternational search[AD]EP0402889  (HOECHST AG [DE]) [AD] 1,5,7,8,18,21,23,26 * siehe Seite 5, Reaktionsschema; Seite 9, Zeile 11 bis Seite 10, Zeile 21;; claims 1,2 *;
 [AD]EP0057885  (HOECHST AG [DE]) [AD] 1,5,7,8,18,21,23,26 * page 13, line 26 - page 14, line 34; example 11; claims 1,3 *;
 [AD]EP0028318  (HOECHST AG [DE]) [AD] 1,5,7,8,18,21,23,26 * siehe Seite 7, Reaktionsschema; page 13, line 4 - line 33; claims 1,2,4 *;
 [AD]EP0690060  (HOECHST AG [DE]) [AD] 1,5,7,8,18,21,23,26 * abstract *;
 [A]DE4423055  (HOECHST AG [DE]) [A] 1,5,7,8,18,21,23,26 * siehe Seite 10, Zeilen 13-16; Seite 13, Zeile 1 bis Seite 15, Zeile 17;; claim 1 *;
 [AD]EP0709426  (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) [AD] 8,13,16 * the whole document *;
 [AD]EP0723990  (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) [AD] 8,13,16 * the whole document *