Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0991396

EP0991396 - BED, SPECIALLY A MEDICAL OR CARE BED [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  19.01.2004
Database last updated on 22.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.03.2010Change - representativepublished on 21.04.2010  [2010/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
VÖLKER MÖBELPRODUKTIONS-GESELLSCHAFT mbH
Wullener Feld 79
D-58454 Witten / DE
[2000/15]
Inventor(s)01 / VÖLKER, Heinrich
Kohlenstrasse 13
D-58452 Witten / DE
[2000/15]
Representative(s)dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB
Deichmannhaus am Dom
Bahnhofsvorplatz 1
50667 Köln / DE
[N/P]
Former [2010/15]von Kreisler Selting Werner
Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1
50667 Köln / DE
Former [2000/15]Hilleringmann, Jochen, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Patentanwälte von Kreisler-Selting-Werner, Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 (Deichmannhaus)
50667 Köln / DE
Application number, filing date98924302.712.05.1998
[2000/15]
WO1998EP02758
Priority number, dateDE199712676224.06.1997         Original published format: DE 19726762
[2000/15]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9858616
Date:30.12.1998
Language:DE
[1998/52]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0991396
Date:12.04.2000
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.12.1998
[2000/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP30.12.1998
ClassificationInternational:A61G7/015, A47C21/08
[2000/15]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL [2000/15]
TitleGerman:BETT, INSBESONDERE KRANKEN- ODER PFLEGEBETT[2000/15]
English:BED, SPECIALLY A MEDICAL OR CARE BED[2000/15]
French:LIT, NOTAMMENT LIT POUR MALADE OU POUR PRODIGUER DES SOINS[2000/15]
Entry into regional phase07.12.1999National basic fee paid 
07.12.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
07.12.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.01.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
07.12.1999Examination requested  [2000/15]
11.03.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.07.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/10]
22.08.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2004/10]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
30.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
28.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.200306   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[X]FR2239235  (LIT TOUS SOINS [FR]) [X] 1-7,11,18 * page 2, line 33 - page 3, line 36 * * page 5, line 15 - line 29; figures 1,2,9,10 *;
 [A]WO8500745  (IDEO AB [SE]) [A] 1,9,10 * the whole document *;
 [D]EP0153362  (IDEO AB [SE]);
 [A]DE8814431U  (KÖTTER) [A] 1,4,13 * the whole document *;
 [AD]DE1718671U  (BOROWSKY WOLFGANG [DE]) [AD] 14 * page 3, line 3 - line 11; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]US2750605  (BLEVINS STANLEY D) [A] 14 * the whole document *
by applicantEP0153362
 AT28269B
 DE29505180U
 DE1718671U
 DE7324686U