Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0993752

EP0993752 - A METHOD OF HANDOVER IN A COMMUNICATION SYSTEM, SUCH A SYSTEM AND A BASE STATION CONTROLLER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.06.2005
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip14.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT, PT
published on 16.04.2008  [2008/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nokia Corporation
Keilalahdentie 4
02150 Espoo / FI
[2002/11]
Former [2000/16]For all designated states
Nokia Networks Oy
Keilalahdentie 4
02150 Espoo / FI
Inventor(s)01 / LEMPIÄINEN, Jukka
Kaarenjalka 3 D 78
FIN-00940 Helsinki / FI
[2000/16]
Representative(s)Ruuskanen, Juha-Pekka
Page White & Farrer
Runeberginkatu 5, 10th Fl
00100 Helsinki / FI
[N/P]
Former [2002/42]Ruuskanen, Juha-Pekka
Page White & Farrer Runeberginkatu 5, 10th Floor
00100 Helsinki / FI
Former [2002/20](deleted)
...
Former [2000/16]Savela, Antti-Jussi , et al
Patent Agency Compatent Ltd. Pitkänsillanranta 3 B
00530 Helsinki / FI
Application number, filing date98924333.201.06.1998
[2000/16]
WO1998FI00464
Priority number, dateFI1997000239605.06.1997         Original published format: FI 972396
[2000/16]
Filing languageFI
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9858515
Date:23.12.1998
Language:EN
[1998/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0993752
Date:19.04.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.12.1998
[2000/16]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0993752
Date:18.08.2004
Language:EN
[2004/34]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE23.12.1998
ClassificationInternational:H04Q7/38
[2000/16]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/16]
Extension statesAL05.11.1999
LT05.11.1999
LV05.11.1999
MK05.11.1999
RO05.11.1999
SI05.11.1999
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUM WEITERREICHEN IN EINEM KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM, EIN DERARTIGES SYSTEM UND EIN BASE STATION CONTROLLER[2000/16]
English:A METHOD OF HANDOVER IN A COMMUNICATION SYSTEM, SUCH A SYSTEM AND A BASE STATION CONTROLLER[2000/16]
French:TRANSFERT INTERCELLULAIRE DANS UN SYSTEME DE COMMUNICATION, SYSTEME UTILISE ET CONTROLEUR DE STATIONS DE BASE[2000/16]
Entry into regional phase01.06.1998Translation filed 
05.11.1999National basic fee paid 
05.11.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
05.11.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.12.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE
05.11.1999Examination requested  [2000/16]
09.01.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.03.2004Fee for grant paid
24.03.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)19.05.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/32]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
13.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
12.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
12.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
14.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT18.08.2004
BE18.08.2004
CH18.08.2004
FI18.08.2004
FR18.08.2004
IT18.08.2004
LI18.08.2004
NL18.08.2004
DK18.11.2004
GR18.11.2004
SE18.11.2004
DE19.11.2004
ES29.11.2004
PT18.01.2005
[2008/16]
Former [2006/32]AT18.08.2004
BE18.08.2004
CH18.08.2004
FI18.08.2004
FR18.08.2004
LI18.08.2004
NL18.08.2004
DK18.11.2004
GR18.11.2004
SE18.11.2004
DE19.11.2004
ES29.11.2004
Former [2006/13]AT18.08.2004
BE18.08.2004
CH18.08.2004
FI18.08.2004
LI18.08.2004
NL18.08.2004
DK18.11.2004
GR18.11.2004
SE18.11.2004
DE19.11.2004
ES29.11.2004
Former [2006/03]AT18.08.2004
BE18.08.2004
CH18.08.2004
FI18.08.2004
LI18.08.2004
DK18.11.2004
GR18.11.2004
SE18.11.2004
DE19.11.2004
ES29.11.2004
Former [2005/28]AT18.08.2004
BE18.08.2004
CH18.08.2004
FI18.08.2004
LI18.08.2004
DK18.11.2004
GR18.11.2004
SE18.11.2004
ES29.11.2004
Former [2005/23]AT18.08.2004
CH18.08.2004
FI18.08.2004
LI18.08.2004
DK18.11.2004
GR18.11.2004
SE18.11.2004
ES29.11.2004
Former [2005/22]AT18.08.2004
CH18.08.2004
FI18.08.2004
LI18.08.2004
DK18.11.2004
GR18.11.2004
SE18.11.2004
Former [2005/21]AT18.08.2004
CH18.08.2004
FI18.08.2004
LI18.08.2004
GR18.11.2004
SE18.11.2004
Former [2005/18]AT18.08.2004
FI18.08.2004
GR18.11.2004
SE18.11.2004
Former [2005/13]AT18.08.2004
FI18.08.2004
SE18.11.2004
Former [2005/11]FI18.08.2004
SE18.11.2004
Former [2005/10]SE18.11.2004
Cited inInternational search[X]WO9535007  (NOKIA TELECOMMUNICATIONS OY [FI], et al);
 [X]GB2295943  (MOTOROLA INC [US])