blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0992170 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0992170



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 132
28.08.2012 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
08.11.2006 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
24.11.2005 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
15.09.2005 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
15.09.2005 French translation of claims Search / examination 2
15.09.2005 German translation of the claims Search / examination 3
15.09.2005 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
25.07.2005 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
25.07.2005 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
25.07.2005 Text intended for grant Search / examination 16
25.08.2004 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
15.07.2002 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
03.07.2002 Request for change of representative Search / examination 2
24.01.2002 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
31.12.2001 Request for transfer of rights Search / examination 28
14.12.2001 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
23.02.2001 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
14.04.2000 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
31.03.2000 Document concerning representation Search / examination 2
01.03.2000 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
04.11.1999 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 1
04.11.1999 Claims Search / examination 2
04.11.1999 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
07.10.1999 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 10
12.03.1999 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
09.03.1999 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
18.01.1999 Priority document Search / examination 18
19.12.1998 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
19.12.1998 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 17