blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0992170


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
10.11.2006 No opposition filed within time limit published on  13.12.2006  [2006/50]
19.11.2005 (Expected) grant published on  04.01.2006  [2006/01]
23.09.2005 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
23.09.2005 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
15.07.2005 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
25.06.2005 New entry: Renewal fee paid
25.06.2004 New entry: Renewal fee paid
26.06.2003 New entry: Renewal fee paid
13.07.2002 Change - representative published on  28.08.2002  [2002/35]
21.06.2002 Renewal fee
25.01.2002 Change - applicant published on  13.03.2002  [2002/11]
21.06.2001 Renewal fee
21.06.2000 Renewal fee
14.04.2000 Change - representative published on  31.05.2000 [2000/22]
25.02.2000 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  12.04.2000 [2000/15]
25.02.2000 Request for examination filed published on  12.04.2000 [2000/15]
04.02.2000 PCT data prior to European publication
19.01.2000 PCT data prior to European publication
11.01.2000 PCT data prior to European publication
16.12.1999 Amendment by applicant
11.11.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
08.04.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
09.03.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
30.09.1998 PCT data prior to European publication