blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0992170
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP2002505055Global Dossier 12.02.2002A
Priority number Date
FI972722 24.06.1997
FI9800469 02.06.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP0992170Global Dossier 04.01.2006B1
EP0992170 12.04.2000A1
Priority number Date
FI972722 24.06.1997
FI9800469 02.06.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU7656498 04.01.1999A
Priority number Date
FI972722 24.06.1997
FI9800469 02.06.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE69833110T 03.08.2006T2
DE69833110D 30.03.2006D1
Priority number Date
FI972722 24.06.1997
FI9800469 02.06.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO9859513Global Dossier 30.12.1998A1
Priority number Date
FI972722 24.06.1997
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
FI105309B 14.07.2000B
FI972722 25.12.1998A
Priority number Date
FI972722 24.06.1997
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US6377804 23.04.2002B1
Priority number Date
FI972722 24.06.1997