Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0992170

EP0992170 - METHOD OF OPERATING A DUAL MODE MOBILE TELEPHONE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.11.2006
Database last updated on 19.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip10.11.2006No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 13.12.2006  [2006/50]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nokia Corporation
Keilalahdentie 4
02150 Espoo / FI
[2002/11]
Former [2000/15]For all designated states
NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD.
Keilalahdentie 4
02150 Espoo / FI
Inventor(s)01 / LINTULAMPI, Raino
Teponkentäntie 9
FIN-90810 Kiviniemi / FI
[2000/15]
Representative(s)Simmelvuo, Markku Kalevi , et al
Papula Oy
ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR
Helsinki / FI
[N/P]
Former [2002/35]Simmelvuo, Markku , et al
Papula Oy, Patent Agency Papula P.O. Box 981
00101 Helsinki / FI
Former [2000/22]Johansson, Folke Anders , et al
Nokia Corporation, P.O. Box 319
00045 Nokia Group / FI
Former [2000/15]Johansson, Folke Anders , et al
Nokia Corporation, P.O. Box 226
00045 Nokia Group / FI
Application number, filing date98924338.102.06.1998
[2000/15]
WO1998FI00469
Priority number, dateFI1997000272224.06.1997         Original published format: FI 972722
[2000/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9859513
Date:30.12.1998
Language:EN
[1998/52]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0992170
Date:12.04.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.12.1998
[2000/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0992170
Date:04.01.2006
Language:EN
[2006/01]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE30.12.1998
ClassificationInternational:H04Q7/38, H04Q7/32
[2000/15]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/15]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUM BETREIBEN EINES DUALMODE-MOBILTELEFONS[2000/15]
English:METHOD OF OPERATING A DUAL MODE MOBILE TELEPHONE[2000/15]
French:PROCEDE DE FONCTIONNEMENT D'UN TELEPHONE MOBILE DOUBLE MODE[2000/15]
Entry into regional phase24.01.2000National basic fee paid 
24.01.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
24.01.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.01.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
04.11.1999Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
24.01.2000Examination requested  [2000/15]
25.07.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.09.2005Fee for grant paid
15.09.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.10.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/50]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
13.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
12.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
12.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
14.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
14.06.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
Cited inInternational search[X]WO9638992  (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al);
 [X]WO9628947  (NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD [FI], et al);
 [A]GB2289191  (MOTOROLA INC [US])
 [X]  - FOURTH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON INTELLIGENCE IN SERVICES AND NETWORKS, IS&N'97, Cernobbio, Italy, May 1997, PROCEEDINGS TOWARDS GLOBAL MULTIMEDIA MOBILITY, (J.C. FRANCIS et al.), pages 371, 374 and 375.,