Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0979265

EP0979265 - LUBRICATING OIL COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  13.12.2002
Database last updated on 18.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip13.12.2002No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 29.01.2003  [2003/05]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Infineum USA L.P.
1900 East Linden Avenue
Linden, New Jersey 07036 / US
[2000/07]
Inventor(s)01 / DUNN, Adrian
22 Craven Common Uffington Faringdon
Oxfordshire SN7 7RN / GB
02 / LENACK, Alain, Louis, Pierre
16, rue de la République
F-76000 Rouen / FR
03 / SKINNER, Philip
4 The Cleave Harwell Didcot
Oxfordshire OX11 0EW / GB
[2000/07]
Representative(s)Mansell, Keith Rodney
Infineum UK Ltd.
Law Department
P.O. Box 1
Milton Hill
Abingdon, Oxfordshire OX13 6BB / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/07]Mansell, Keith Rodney
Infineum UK Ltd Law Department POB 1 Milton Hill
Abingdon, Oxfordshire OX13 6BB / GB
Application number, filing date98924505.529.04.1998
[2000/07]
WO1998IB00947
Priority number, dateGB1997000900602.05.1997         Original published format: GB 9709006
[2000/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9850501
Date:12.11.1998
Language:EN
[1998/45]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0979265
Date:16.02.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.11.1998
[2000/07]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0979265
Date:06.02.2002
Language:EN
[2002/06]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP12.11.1998
ClassificationInternational:C10M163/00, // (C10M163/00, 125:26, 133:52, 139:00, 159:20, 159:22, 159:24),(C10N10/04, 20:02, 30:02)
[2000/07]
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [2000/07]
TitleGerman:SCHMIERÖLZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN[2000/07]
English:LUBRICATING OIL COMPOSITIONS[2000/07]
French:COMPOSITIONS D'HUILE LUBRIFIANTE[2000/07]
Entry into regional phase27.10.1999National basic fee paid 
27.10.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
27.10.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.06.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
27.10.1999Examination requested  [2000/07]
24.05.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.08.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.06.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
27.07.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.10.2001Fee for grant paid
26.10.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)07.11.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2003/05]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
19.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[DX]EP0331359  (EXXON CHEMICAL PATENTS INC [US]) [DX] 1-15 * examples 4-6,13 *;
 [A]EP0317348  (EXXON CHEMICAL PATENTS INC [US]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * page 5, lines 21-26 * * page 7, lines 51-58 * * table 1 *