Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0989861

EP0989861 - IMMUNOGENIC COMPOSITIONS FOR INDUCTION OF ANTI-TUMOR IMMUNITY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  08.01.2010
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip08.01.2010Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 10.02.2010  [2010/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
YEDA RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT CO., LTD.
The Weizmann Institute of Science P.O. Box 95
76100 Rehovot / IL
[2007/44]
Former [2007/43]For all designated states
YEDA RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMEMT CO., LTD.
The Weizmann Institute of Science P.O. Box 95
76100 Rehovot / IL
Former [2000/14]For all designated states
YEDA RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT COMPANY, LTD.
at the Weizmann Institute of Science P.O. Box 95
76100 Rehovot / IL
Inventor(s)01 / COHEN, Irun, R.
Hankin Street 11
76354 Rehovot / IL
02 / ROTTER, Varda
Mivtsa Kadesh 2
75221 Rishon LeZion / IL
03 / WOLKOWICZ, Roland
Apartment 9,130 Arch Street
Redwood City, CA 94062 / US
04 / RUIZ, Pedro, J.
Beckman Center B002
Stanford, CA 94305-5429 / US
05 / EREZ-ALON, Neta
Lea Street 18
69412 Tel Aviv / IL
06 / HERKEL, Johannes
Griesaeckerstrasse 3
D-97078 Wuerzburg / DE
[2000/14]
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/35]Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
Former [2000/14]VOSSIUS & PARTNER
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date98924544.409.06.1998
[2000/14]
WO1998IL00266
Priority number, dateIL1997012104109.06.1997         Original published format: IL 12104197
[2000/14]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9856416
Date:17.12.1998
Language:EN
[1998/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0989861
Date:05.04.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.12.1998
[2000/14]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP17.12.1998
ClassificationInternational:A61K39/395, A61K48/00, C07K16/30, C07K16/18
[2000/14]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/14]
TitleGerman:IMMUNZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UM ANTI-TUMORIMMUNITÄT ZU INDUZIEREN[2000/14]
English:IMMUNOGENIC COMPOSITIONS FOR INDUCTION OF ANTI-TUMOR IMMUNITY[2000/14]
French:COMPOSITIONS IMMUNOGENES SUSCEPTIBLES DE DECLENCHER UNE IMMUNITE ANTITUMORALE[2000/14]
Entry into regional phase10.01.2000National basic fee paid 
10.01.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
10.01.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.12.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
10.01.2000Examination requested  [2000/14]
08.03.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
19.09.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.02.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
24.08.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.09.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
05.12.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.05.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07)
01.04.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.12.2008Date of oral proceedings
03.03.2009Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 26.03.2009
03.03.2009Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
26.03.2009Date of oral proceedings
26.03.2009Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
30.03.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.08.2009Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2010/06]
25.09.2009Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2010/06]
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
01.04.2008Request for further processing filed
01.04.2008Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
18.04.2008Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
13.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
12.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
12.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
14.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
14.06.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
14.06.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
14.06.2007Renewal fee patent year 10
28.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 11
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.200912   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[XY]WO9318792  (BIOMIRA INC [CA]) [X] 1-4,10-12,20-22 * page 4, line 15 - page 5, line 6 * * page 6, line 24 - page 7, line 13 * * page 15, lines 5-35 * * table 1 * [Y] 5-9,13-19,27-30;
 [X]WO9601126  (IMMUNOMEDICS INC [US]) [X] 1-4,10-12,20-22 * page 2, line 32 - page 3, line 10 * * page 7, lines 15-26 * * page 15, line 1 - page 16, line 24 * * examples 2-4 * * claim 21 *;
 [X]WO9704092  (RHONE POULENC RORER SA [FR], et al) [X] 22-26 * pages 88-90 * * claim 36 *;
 [X]WO9213970  (ONCOGENE SCIENCE INC [US]) [X] 22-26 * page 18, lines 5-10 * * page 21, lines 23-24 * * page 45, lines 11-13 *;
 [PX]WO9818825  (RHONE POULENC RORER SA [FR], et al) [PX] 22-26 * page 31 * * claim 5 *;
 [Y]  - ZUSMAN I. ET AL., "Tumor-suppressor effets of anti-p53 IgG on chemically induced colon cancer in rats", THE CANCER JOURNAL, (199704), vol. 10, no. 2, pages 116 - 120, XP002081863 [Y] 5-9,13-19 * page 116, column L, lines 14-25 * * page 117, column R, lines 41-46 * * see section: Discussion *
 [X]  - NICHOLSON S. ET AL., "Anti-tumor immune responses following monoclonal antibody therapy of ovarian cancer", PROC.ANNU.MEET.AM.ASSOC.CANCER RES, A2702, (199703), vol. 38, XP002081861 [X] 1-4,10-12,20-22 * the whole document *
 [DX]  - GANNON J V ET AL, "Activating mutations in p53 produce a common conformational effect. A monoclonal antibody specific for the mutant form", EMBO JOURNAL, (199003), vol. 9, no. 5, pages 1595 - 1602, XP000676347 [DX] 22-26 * page 1595, column R, line 52 - page 1596, column L, line 9 * * see page 1601 "Antibodies" *
 [X]  - JANNOT C B ET AL, "Characterization of scFv-421, a single-chain antibody targetd to p53", BIOCHEMICAL AND BIOPHYSICAL RESEARCH COMMUNICATIONS, (19970113), vol. 230, no. 2, pages 242 - 246, XP002035502 [X] 22-26 * figure 4 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/bbrc.1996.5930
 [XY]  - WOLKOWICZ R. ET AL., "The DNA binding activity of wild type p53 is modulated by blocking its various antigenic epitopes", ONCOGENE, (1995), vol. 10, pages 1167 - 1174, XP002081864 [X] 22-26 * abstract * * see pages 1170-1171 section "PAb-246, PAb-1620 and PAb-200.47 monoclonal..." * * page 1172, column R, lines 51-65 * [Y] 27-30
 [PX]  - RUIZ P.J. ET AL., "Idiotypic immunization induces immunity to mutated p53 and tumor rejection", NATURE MEDICINE, (199806), vol. 4, no. 6, pages 710 - 712, XP002081865 [PX] 1-27 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nm0698-710