Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0996278

EP0996278 - ELECTRONIC WATERMARKING METHOD AND METHOD OF EXTRACTING WATERMARK INFORMATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  27.06.2008
Database last updated on 08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip27.06.2008Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 30.07.2008  [2008/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kowa Co., Ltd.
6-29, Nishiki 3-chome Naka-ku
Nagoya-shi, Aichi 460-0003 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/17]For all designated states
Kowa Co., Ltd.
6-29, Nishiki 3-chome
Naka-ku, Nagoya-shi, Aichi 460-0003 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / MATSUI, Kineo
5-57, Ootsumachi,Yokosuka-shi
Kanagawa 239-0808 / JP
02 / ONISHI, Junji
6-29-3, Kamariyahigashi,Kanazawa-ku,Yokohama-shi
Kanagawa 236-0042 / JP
[2000/17]
Representative(s)TBK
Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/22]TBK-Patent
Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
Former [2005/33]TBK-Patent
Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
Former [2000/17]Pellmann, Hans-Bernd, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date98924656.615.06.1998
[2000/17]
WO1998JP02674
Priority number, dateJP1997017735302.07.1997         Original published format: JP 17735397
[2000/17]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9901980
Date:14.01.1999
Language:EN
[1999/02]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0996278
Date:26.04.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.01.1999
[2000/17]
Search report(s)International search reportJP14.01.1999
(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP29.09.2005
ClassificationInternational:H04N1/387, H04N1/32
[2005/46]
Former International [2000/17]H04N1/387
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/17]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN FÜR ELEKTRONISCHE WASSERZEICHEN UND VERFAHREN ZUM EXTRAHIEREN VON WASSERZEICHENINFORMATION[2000/17]
English:ELECTRONIC WATERMARKING METHOD AND METHOD OF EXTRACTING WATERMARK INFORMATION[2000/17]
French:PROCEDE ELECTRONIQUE POUR REALISER DES FILIGRANES ET PROCEDE POUR EXTRAIRE DES INFORMATIONS DE FILIGRANES[2000/17]
Entry into regional phase30.12.1999Translation filed 
30.12.1999National basic fee paid 
30.12.1999Search fee paid 
30.12.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
30.12.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.11.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP
30.12.1999Examination requested  [2000/17]
05.10.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.01.2008Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2008/31]
27.02.2008Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2008/31]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
29.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
27.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
30.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
29.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
30.06.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
28.06.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.200710   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search   [ ] No further relevant documents disclosed
International search[Y]  - ONISHI J., ET AL., "A WATERMARKING SCHEME TO IMAGE DATA BY PN SEQUENCE.", SYMPOSIUM ON CYPHER AND INFORMATION SECURITY, XX, XX, XX, (19970101), pages 01 - 08., XP002917185
 [Y]  - MATSUI K., ET AL., "EMBEDDING A SIGNATURE TO PICTURES UNDER WAVELET TRANSFORMATION.", THE TRANSACTIONS OF THE IEICE, NEW YORK, NY, US, US, (19960601), vol. J79-D-II., no. 06., pages 1017 - 1024., XP002917186
 [P]  - ONISHI J., ET AL., "DETECTION OF WATERMARK FROM A CLIPPED PICTURE USING WAVELET.", EIZO JOHO MEDIA GAKKAI GIJUTSU HOKOKU - ITE TECHNICAL REPORT, EIZO JOHO MEDIA GAKKAI, TOKYO, JP, JP, (19970701), vol. 21., no. 42., ISSN 1342-6893, pages 01 - 05., XP002917187
 [P]  - ONISHI J., ET AL., "A METHOD OF WATERMARKING WITH MULTIRESOLUTION ANALYSIS AND PN SEQUENCE.", THE TRANSACTIONS OF THE IEICE, NEW YORK, NY, US, US, (19971101), vol. J80-D-II., no. 11., pages 3020 - 3028., XP002917188
 [Y]  - ISHIZUKA H., ET AL., "ON AN EXPERIMENTAL EVALUATION OF STEGANOGRAPHY WITH WAVELET TRANSFORM.", SYMPOSIUM ON CYPHER AND INFORMATION SECURITY, XX, XX, XX, (19970101), pages 01 - 10., XP002917189