EP0984963 - NOVEL COMPOUNDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.02.2002 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.08.2006 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 27.09.2006 [2006/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AstraZeneca AB 151 85 Södertälje / SE | [2000/35] |
Former [2000/19] | For all designated states AstraZeneca UK Limited 15 Stanhope Gate London W1Y 6LN / GB | ||
Former [2000/11] | For all designated states Astra Pharmaceuticals Limited Home Park Kings Langley, Herts WD4 8DH / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KINDON, Nicholas Astra Charnwood,Bakewell Road Loughborough, Leics. LE11 5RH / GB | 02 /
MEGHANI, Premji Astra Charnwood,Bakewell Road Loughborough, Leics. LE11 5RH / GB | 03 /
THOM, Stephen Astra Charnwood,Bakewell Road Loughborough, Leics. LE11 5RH / GB | [2000/11] | Representative(s) | As Sivborg, Susanne Birgitta, et al Astra AB, Intellectual Property, Patents 151 85 Södertälje / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/11] | As Sivborg, Susanne Birgitta, et al Astra AB, Intellectual Property, Patents 151 85 Södertälje / SE | Application number, filing date | 98924708.5 | 18.05.1998 | [2000/11] | WO1998SE00940 | Priority number, date | SE19970002002 | 28.05.1997 Original published format: SE 9702002 | [2000/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9854180 | Date: | 03.12.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0984963 | Date: | 15.03.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.12.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0984963 | Date: | 11.04.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 03.12.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C07D417/06, C07D413/06, C07D409/06, C07D407/06, A61K31/505, A61K31/33 | [2000/11] | CPC: |
C07D405/06 (EP,US);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P1/02 (EP);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P17/06 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
C07D405/14 (EP,US);
C07D409/06 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/11] | Extension states | LT | 28.12.1999 | LV | 28.12.1999 | MK | 28.12.1999 | RO | 28.12.1999 | SI | 28.12.1999 | Title | German: | VERBINDUNGEN | [2000/11] | English: | NOVEL COMPOUNDS | [2000/11] | French: | NOUVEAUX COMPOSES | [2000/11] | Entry into regional phase | 28.12.1999 | National basic fee paid | 28.12.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.12.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.12.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 28.12.1999 | Examination requested [2000/11] | 30.08.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.09.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.11.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 22.11.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.01.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | MC | 11.06.2001 | [2006/39] | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9213844 (WARNER LAMBERT CO [US]); | [A]WO9704760 (CONSIGLIO NAZIONALE RICERCHE [IT], et al) |