Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1086593

EP1086593 - SEQUENCE ADAPTIVE BIT ALLOCATION FOR PICTURES ENCODING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.06.2004
Database last updated on 22.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip04.06.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 21.07.2004  [2004/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
STMicroelectronics Asia Pacific Pte Ltd.
28 Ang Mo Kio Industrial Park 2
Singapore 569508 / SG
[2001/51]
Former [2001/13]For all designated states
SGS-Thomson Microelectronics Asia Pacific (PTE) Ltd
28 Ang Mo Kio Industrial Park 2
Singapore 569508 / SG
Inventor(s)01 / HUI, Yau, Wai, Lucas
10H Braddell Hill 24-31
Singapore 579727 / SG
 [2001/13]
Representative(s)Cerbaro, Elena , et al
Studio Torta S.p.A.
Via Viotti, 9
10121 Torino / IT
[N/P]
Former [2001/13]Cerbaro, Elena, Dr. , et al
STUDIO TORTA S.r.l., Via Viotti, 9
10121 Torino / IT
Application number, filing date98924735.830.05.1998
[2001/13]
WO1998SG00038
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9963760
Date:09.12.1999
Language:EN
[1999/49]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1086593
Date:28.03.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.12.1999
[2001/13]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1086593
Date:30.07.2003
Language:EN
[2003/31]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP09.12.1999
ClassificationInternational:H04N7/50
[2001/13]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2001/15]
Former [2001/13]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:SEQUENZADAPTIVE BIT-ZUORDNUNG ZUR CODIERUNG VON BILDERN[2001/13]
English:SEQUENCE ADAPTIVE BIT ALLOCATION FOR PICTURES ENCODING[2001/13]
French:ALLOCATION DE BITS S'ADAPTANT EN FONCTION DES SEQUENCES POUR LE CODAGE D'IMAGES[2001/13]
Entry into regional phase21.12.2000National basic fee paid 
21.12.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
21.12.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.12.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
21.12.2000Examination requested  [2001/13]
20.04.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08)
11.12.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.04.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
05.09.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.01.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time
13.03.2003Fee for grant paid
13.03.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)04.05.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/30]
Request for further processing for:17.03.2003Request for further processing filed
17.03.2003Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
28.03.2003Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.12.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
17.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
28.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
26.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Cited inInternational search[A]EP0804035  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-10 * page 7, line 21 - page 8, line 50 * * see equations (1)-(3) * * figures 6,8 *;
 [A]EP0655867  (PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]) [A] 1-10 * page 4, line 24 - page 4, line 50 * * see equations (5),(6) *;
 [A]US5686963  (UZ K METIN [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * column 3, line 46 - column 6, line 13 * * column 7, line 56 - column 9, line 53 * * column 12, line 32 - column 13, line 34 * * column 15, line 38 - column 15, line 54 *;
 [A]EP0705040  (SONY CORP [JP]) [A] 1-10 * page 6, line 23 - page 7, line 16 * * figure 10 *;
 [A]  - HUA L ET AL, "EXPERIMENTAL INVESTIGATION ON MPEG-2 BASED VIDEO CODING AT 22 MBPS", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS, (199508), vol. 41, no. 3, pages 615 - 619, XP000539514 [A] 1-10 * see section "3. Adaptive quantization and Rate Control" *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/30.468028
 [A]  - TIHAO CHIANG ET AL, "A NEW RATE CONTROL SCHEME USING QUADRATIC RATE DISTORTION MODEL", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON CIRCUITS AND SYSTEMS FOR VIDEO TECHNOLOGY, (199702), vol. 7, no. 1, pages 246 - 250, XP000678897 [A] 1-10 * see section "III. Rate Control Description" *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/76.554439