Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0984885

EP0984885 - LOAD AND DEFLECTION MEASUREMENT SYSTEM FOR ELASTOMERIC BEARINGS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.10.2003
Database last updated on 08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip03.10.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 19.11.2003  [2003/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Oil States Industries, Inc.
7701-A South Cooper Street
Arlington, Texas 76001-7015 / US
[2002/23]
Former [2000/11]For all designated states
CONTINENTAL EMSCO COMPANY
Suite 100, 13111 Northwest Freeway
Houston, TX 77040-6311 / US
Inventor(s)01 / MOSES, Charles, J.
1605 Vallywood Trail
Mansfield, TX 76063 / US
02 / HOGAN, Michael, E.
3320 Summergrove Drive
Arlington, TX 76017 / US
[2000/11]
Representative(s)Banzer, Hans-Jörg , et al
Kraus & Weisert
Patentanwälte PartGmbB
Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
80539 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2003/44]Banzer, Hans-Jörg, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Kraus & Weisert Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
80539 München / DE
Former [2000/11]Weisert, Annekäte, Dipl.-Ing. Dr.-Ing. , et al
Patentanwälte Kraus Weisert & Partner Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
80539 München / DE
Application number, filing date98924937.028.05.1998
[2000/11]
WO1998US10843
Priority number, dateUS1997086882404.06.1997         Original published format: US 868824
[2000/11]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9855355
Date:10.12.1998
Language:EN
[1998/49]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0984885
Date:15.03.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.12.1998
[2000/11]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0984885
Date:27.11.2002
Language:EN
[2002/48]
Search report(s)International search reportEP10.12.1998
ClassificationInternational:B63B21/50, F16F1/38
[2000/11]
Designated contracting statesFR [2000/11]
TitleGerman:KRAFT-UND VERFORMUNGSSYSTEM FÜR ELASTOMER-LAGER[2000/11]
English:LOAD AND DEFLECTION MEASUREMENT SYSTEM FOR ELASTOMERIC BEARINGS[2000/11]
French:SYSTEME DE MESURE DE CHARGES ET DE FLEXIONS POUR PALIERS ELASTOMERES[2000/11]
Entry into regional phase29.11.1999National basic fee paid 
29.11.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
29.11.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.12.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
29.11.1999Examination requested  [2000/11]
23.08.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.01.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.03.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
28.06.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.08.2002Fee for grant paid
20.08.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)28.08.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/47]
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
14.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
14.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[YA]US4780026  (GUNDERSON RICHARD H [US]) [Y] 1-5,10,14,17,18,36-38,41-43 * column 4, line 33 - column 5, line 34; figures 1-6 * [A] 19-21;
 [YA]US4644805  (HAEFNER HANS W [DE]) [Y] 1-5,10,14,17,18,36-38,41-43 * column 2, line 21 - line 57; figure 1 * [A] 7-9,11,12,16,22,24-32;
 [Y]GB2299649  (CONTINENTAL EMSCO CO [US]) [Y] 17,18 * page 21, line 3 - line 9; figures 1,2 *;
 [YA]US4836029  (SKALA DENNIS P [US], et al) [Y] 36-38,41-43 * column A; figure 1 * [A] 6,22;
 [A]GB2035240  (BRITISH PETROLEUM CO) [A] 1,6,22,37,38 * page 2, line 50 - line 88; figures 1-9 *;
 [A]EP0255084  (PFISTER GMBH [DE]) [A] 15,32 * column 2, line 38 - line 49; figure 1 *
by applicant   - CRC HANDBOOK OF MATHEMATICAL TABLES, BOCA RATON,FLORIDA, CHEMICAL RUBBER COMPANY PRESS INC., page 43-44,