Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1003849

EP1003849 - METHOD FOR REDUCING EXPRESSION VARIABILITY OF TRANSGENES IN PLANTS CELLS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  18.03.2005
Database last updated on 18.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.03.2005Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 04.05.2005  [2005/18]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NORTH CAROLINA STATE UNIVERSITY
103 Bynum Hall, Campus Box 7003
Raleigh, NC 27695-7003 / US
[2000/22]
Inventor(s)01 / THOMPSON, William, F.
12705 Lindley Drive
Raleigh, NC 27614 / US
[2000/22]
Representative(s)HGF Limited
1 City Walk
Leeds LS11 9DX / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/22]Harrison Goddard Foote
Belmont House, 20 Wood Lane
Leeds LS6 2AE / GB
Application number, filing date98925120.202.06.1998
[2000/22]
WO1998US11169
Priority number, dateUS19970048418P03.06.1997         Original published format: US 48418 P
[2000/22]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9855608
Date:10.12.1998
Language:EN
[1998/49]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1003849
Date:31.05.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.12.1998
[2000/22]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US10.12.1998
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.05.2004
ClassificationInternational:C12N15/00, C12N15/82, A01H5/00
[2004/24]
Former International [2000/22]C12N15/00, C12N15/82, C12N5/04, A01H5/00, A01H5/10
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/22]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR VERMINDERUNG DER EXPRESSIONSVARIANZ VON TRANSGENEN IN PFLANZENZELLEN[2000/22]
English:METHOD FOR REDUCING EXPRESSION VARIABILITY OF TRANSGENES IN PLANTS CELLS[2000/22]
French:PROCEDE POUR ATTENUER LA VARIABILITE DE L'EXPRESSION DES TRANSGENES DANS LES CELLULES VEGETALES[2000/22]
Entry into regional phase24.12.1999National basic fee paid 
24.12.1999Search fee paid 
24.12.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
24.12.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.12.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
24.12.1999Examination requested  [2000/22]
22.07.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/18]
01.09.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2005/18]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
13.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
12.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
12.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.200407   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XY]WO9407902  (UNIV NORTH CAROLINA STATE [US]) [X] 1-10 * page 5, line 13 - line 14 * [Y] 6;
 [XY]WO9424293  (SANDOZ AG [AT], et al) [X] 1-5,7-10 * the whole document * [Y] 6;
 [PX]WO9816650  (DU PONT [US], et al) [PX] 1 * the whole document *;
 [E]WO9844139  (MYCOGEN PLANT SCIENCE INC [US]) [E] 1-5,8-10 * the whole document *
 [A]  VAIN P ET AL, "Foreign gene delivery into monocotyledonous species", BIOTECHNOLOGY ADVANCES, ELSEVIER PUBLISHING, BARKING, GB, (1995), vol. 13, no. 4, ISSN 0734-9750, pages 653 - 671, XP004044845 [A] 1-10 * page 662, line 26 - line 32 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0734-9750(95)02009-8
 [A]  AVRAMOVA ZOYA ET AL, "Matrix attachment regions and transcribed sequences within a long chromosomal continuum containing maize Adh1", PLANT CELL, (1995), vol. 7, no. 10, ISSN 1040-4651, pages 1667 - 1680, XP002277539

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1105/tpc.7.10.1667
International search[XE]US5773695  (THOMPSON WILLIAM F [US], et al);
 [XE]US5773689  (THOMPSON WILLIAM F [US], et al);
 [X]  - BREYNE P., ET AL., "CHARACTERIZATION OF A PLANT SCAFFOLD ATTACHMENT REGION IN A DNA FRAGMENT THAT NORMALIZES TRANSGENE EXPRESSION IN TOBACCO.", The Plant Cell, American Society of Plant Biologists, US, US, (19920401), vol. 04., doi:10.1105/tpc.4.4.463, ISSN 1040-4651, pages 463 - 471., XP002910488

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1105/tpc.4.4.463
 [X]  - CLAPHAM D., ET AL., "ENHANCEMENT OF SHORT- AND MEDIUM-TERM EXPRESSION OF TRANSGENES IN EMBRYOGENIC SUSPENSIONS OF PICEA ABIES (L.) KARST.", JOURNAL OF EXPERIMENTAL BOTANY, OXFORD UNIVERSITY PRESS, GB, GB, (19950601), vol. 46., no. 287., doi:10.1093/jxb/46.6.655, ISSN 0022-0957, pages 655 - 662., XP002910489

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/jxb/46.6.655
 [X]  - ALLEN G. C., ET AL., "HIGH-LEVEL TRANSGENE EXPRESSION IN PLANT CELLS:EFFECTS OF A STRONG SCAFFOLD ATTACHMENT REGION FROM TOBACCO.", The Plant Cell, American Society of Plant Biologists, US, US, (19960501), vol. 08., doi:10.1105/tpc.8.5.899, ISSN 1040-4651, pages 899 - 913., XP002910490

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1105/tpc.8.5.899
 [X]  - HAN K.-H., ET AL., "MATRIX ATTACHMENT REGIONS (MARS) ENHANCE TRANSFORMATION FREQUENCY AND TRANSGENE EXPRESSION IN POPLAR.", TRANSGENIC RESEARCH, Springer Netherlands, NL, NL, (19970101), vol. 06., doi:10.1023/A:1018439518649, ISSN 0962-8819, pages 415 - 420., XP002910491

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1023/A:1018439518649
 [X]  - ALLEN G. C., ET AL., "SCAFFOLD ATTACHMENT REGIONS (SARS) INCREASE REPORTER GENE EXPRESSION IN STABLY TRANSFORMED PLANT CELLS.", PLANT PHYSIOLOGY., AMERICAN SOCIETY OF PLANT PHYSIOLOGISTS, ROCKVILLE, MD., US, US, (19930501), vol. 102., no. 01., ISSN 0032-0889, page 100., XP002910492
 [X]  - ALLEN G. C., ET AL., "SCAFFOLD ATTACHMENT REGIONS INCREASE REPORTER GENE EXPRESSION IN STABLY TRANSFORMED PLANT CELLS.", The Plant Cell, American Society of Plant Biologists, US, US, (19930601), vol. 05., doi:10.1105/tpc.5.6.603, ISSN 1040-4651, pages 603 - 613., XP002910493

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1105/tpc.5.6.603
 [AP]  - LIU J.-W., ET AL., "THE INFLUENCE OF TWO PLANT NUCLEAR MATRIX ATTACHMENT REGIONS (MARS) ON GENE EXPRESSION IN TRANSGENIC PLANTS.", MOLECULAR AND GENERAL GENETICS., SPRINGER VERLAG, BERLIN., DE, DE, (19980101), vol. 39., no. 01., ISSN 0026-8925, pages 115 - 123., XP002910494