Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0998263

EP0998263 - PYRROLIDINE DERIVATIVE HAIR GROWTH COMPOSITIONS AND USES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  23.05.2003
Database last updated on 22.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip23.05.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 09.07.2003  [2003/28]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GPI NIL Holdings, Inc.
222 Delaware Avenue
Wilmington, DE 19899 / US
[2000/26]
Former [2000/19]For all designated states
GUILFORD PHARMACEUTICALS INC.
6611 Tributary Street
Baltimore, Maryland 21224 / US
Inventor(s)01 / HAMILTON, Gregory, S.
6501 Frederick Road
Catonsville, MD 21228 / US
02 / STEINER, Joseph, P.
3179 Jupiter Island Court
Mt. Airy, Maryland 21771 / US
[2000/37]
Former [2000/19]01 / HAMILTON, Gregory, S.
6501 Frederick Road
Catonsville, MD 21228 / US
02 / STEINER, Joseph, P.
988 Sugar Maple Street
Hampstead, MD 21074 / US
Representative(s)Bausch, Thorsten , et al
Hoffmann - Eitle
ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR / DE
[N/P]
Former [2003/18]Bausch, Thorsten , et al
Hoffmann.Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Former [2000/19]Portal, Gérard , et al
Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université
75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR
Application number, filing date98925154.103.06.1998
[2000/19]
WO1998US11246
Priority number, dateUS1997086942604.06.1997         Original published format: US 869426
[2000/19]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9855091
Date:10.12.1998
Language:EN
[1998/49]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0998263
Date:10.05.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.12.1998
[2000/19]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP10.12.1998
ClassificationInternational:A61K7/48, A61K31/40, A61K31/44
[2000/19]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/19]
TitleGerman:HAARWUCHSZUSAMMENSETZUNG BASIREND AUF EINEM PYRROLIDINDERIVAT UND ANWENDUNGEN[2000/19]
English:PYRROLIDINE DERIVATIVE HAIR GROWTH COMPOSITIONS AND USES[2000/19]
French:COMPOSITIONS A BASE DE DERIVES DE PYRROLIDINE POUR LA POUSSE DES CHEVEUX ET LEURS UTILISATIONS[2000/19]
Entry into regional phase30.12.1999National basic fee paid 
30.12.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
30.12.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.12.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
31.12.1999Examination requested  [2000/19]
03.01.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/28]
06.02.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2003/28]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
21.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.200205   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[DX]EP0423714  (FUJISAWA PHARMACEUTICAL CO [JP]) [DX] 1-38 * the whole document *;
 [X]WO9318736  (PARDO ARMAND [FR]) [X] 1-4,20-23 * the whole document *;
 [X]EP0519819  (OREAL [FR]) [X] 1-4,20-23 * example 5; claims 1,16-18 *;
 [PX]US5714510  (PROCTOR PETER H [US]) [PX] 1-4,20-23 * column W *;
 [PX]WO9813343  (GUILFORD PHARM INC [US]) [PX] 20-38 * the whole document *