blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0970555

EP0970555 - ELECTRONIC FUSE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  02.03.2002
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip02.03.2002Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 17.04.2002  [2002/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1
DE-80333 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/02]For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / BITENC, Bostjan
Heimgartenstrasse 20
D-82110 Germering / DE
02 / BRAKUS, Bogdan
Peter-Dörfler-Strasse 3
D-82131 Stockdorf / DE
[2000/02]
Application number, filing date98925422.220.03.1998
[2000/02]
WO1998DE00836
Priority number, dateDE199711226124.03.1997         Original published format: DE 19712261
[2000/02]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9843334
Date:01.10.1998
Language:DE
[1998/39]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0970555
Date:12.01.2000
Language:DE
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.10.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/02]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP01.10.1998
ClassificationIPC:H02H9/00
[2000/02]
CPC:
H02H9/001 (EP); H02H3/087 (EP); H02H3/247 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   CH,   DE,   LI [2000/02]
TitleGerman:ELEKTRONISCHE SICHERUNG[2000/02]
English:ELECTRONIC FUSE[2000/02]
French:FUSIBLE ELECTRONIQUE[2000/02]
Entry into regional phase17.09.1999National basic fee paid 
17.09.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
17.09.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.10.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
17.09.1999Examination requested  [2000/02]
08.11.2001Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2002/16]
20.11.2001Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2002/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.200104   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[A]EP0423885  (PHILIPS PATENTVERWALTUNG ;PHILIPS NV (NL)) [A] 1,4 * abstract *;
 [A]US4328459  (MCLEOD JR FENWICK R) [A] 1,4 * column A *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.