blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0995097 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0995097



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 126
10.11.2009 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the postal address of the applicant Search / examination 1
26.03.2004 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
02.10.2003 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
01.10.2003 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
20.09.2003 Request for change of address Search / examination 1
10.04.2003 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
16.01.2003 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
16.01.2003 Translation of the claims Search / examination 3
16.01.2003 Translation of the claims Search / examination 3
19.12.2002 Communication of amended entries Search / examination 2
19.12.2002 Communication of amended entries Search / examination 2
04.12.2002 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
21.11.2002 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
21.11.2002 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
21.11.2002 Text intended for grant Search / examination 16
15.03.2000 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
18.02.2000 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
04.02.2000 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
04.02.2000 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
31.01.2000 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
24.01.2000 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
24.01.2000 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
18.01.2000 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
18.01.2000 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
18.01.2000 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
18.01.2000 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
18.01.2000 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
18.01.2000 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
18.01.2000 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
16.12.1999 Abstract Search / examination 1
16.12.1999 Claims Search / examination 3
16.12.1999 Description Search / examination 12
16.12.1999 Drawings Search / examination 1
16.12.1999 Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure Search / examination 1
16.12.1999 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
24.03.1999 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
12.02.1999 Priority document Search / examination 18
13.01.1999 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 6
13.01.1999 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 17