blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0995097


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
26.03.2004 No opposition filed within time limit published on  12.05.2004  [2004/20]
03.10.2003 Change - applicant published on  19.11.2003  [2003/47]
04.04.2003 (Expected) grant published on  21.05.2003  [2003/21]
29.03.2003 Renewal fee
29.01.2003 Communication of intention to grant a patent
27.12.2002 Change - representative published on  05.02.2003  [2003/06]
13.11.2002 Communication of intention to grant a patent
13.04.2002 Renewal fee
29.03.2001 Renewal fee
03.04.2000 Renewal fee
10.03.2000 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  26.04.2000 [2000/17]
10.03.2000 Request for examination filed published on  26.04.2000 [2000/17]
11.01.2000 PCT data prior to European publication
07.01.2000 PCT data prior to European publication
18.03.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
03.02.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
30.09.1998 PCT data prior to European publication