Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0995097

EP0995097 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR ISOLATING CELL MATERIAL OUT OF A TISSUE MEDIUM AND/OR A LIQUID [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  26.03.2004
Database last updated on 19.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip26.03.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 12.05.2004  [2004/20]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V.
Hansastrasse 27c
80686 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2003/47]For all designated states
Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V.
Hansastrasse 27 c
80686 München / DE
Former [2000/17]For all designated states
FRAUNHOFER-GESELLSCHAFT ZUR FÖRDERUNG DER ANGEWANDTEN FORSCHUNG E.V.
Leonrodstrasse 54
80636 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / DOBLER, Hannes
Ludwig-Thoma-Str. 12
D-71227 Rutesheim / DE
02 / KUHN, Claus
Gammelshauser Strasse 8
D-73105 Dürnau / DE
03 / LINDNER, Hans
Viereichenweg 29
D-70567 Stuttgart / DE
04 / KIESEWETTER, Stefan
Wagenmannsteige 5
D-73760 Ostfildern / DE
05 / BERNHAGEN, Jürgen
Friedrich-Schaal-Strasse 6
D-72074 Tübingen / DE
06 / TOLLE, Gabriele
Johannes-Strauss-Str. 2
D-69190 Walldorf/Baden / DE
07 / TOVAR, Günter
Oberer Grundweg 25
D-70563 Stuttgart / DE
[2000/17]
Representative(s)(deleted)
...
[2003/06]
Former [2000/17]Rösler, Uwe, Dipl.-Phys. , et al
Rösler Patentanwaltskanzlei Landsberger Strasse 480a
81241 München / DE
Application number, filing date98925437.024.03.1998
[2000/17]
WO1998DE00864
Priority number, dateDE199712902808.07.1997         Original published format: DE 19729028
[2000/17]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9902958
Date:21.01.1999
Language:DE
[1999/03]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0995097
Date:26.04.2000
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.01.1999
[2000/17]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0995097
Date:21.05.2003
Language:DE
[2003/21]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.01.1999
ClassificationInternational:G01N1/28, C12M3/08
[2000/17]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/17]
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG SOWIE VERFAHREN ZUR ISOLIERUNG VON ZELLMATERIAL AUS EINEM GEWEBEVERBAND UND/ODER EINER FLÜSSIGKEIT[2000/17]
English:DEVICE AND METHOD FOR ISOLATING CELL MATERIAL OUT OF A TISSUE MEDIUM AND/OR A LIQUID[2000/17]
French:DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE D'ISOLATION DE MATIERE CELLULAIRE DANS UNE ENVELOPPE TISSULAIRE ET/OU UN LIQUIDE[2000/17]
Entry into regional phase16.12.1999National basic fee paid 
16.12.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
16.12.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.12.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
16.12.1999Examination requested  [2000/17]
21.11.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.01.2003Fee for grant paid
16.01.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)24.02.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/20]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
20.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
23.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
20.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Cited inInternational search[YA]EP0590504  (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH]) [Y] 1-3,5,6,10,12-14 * abstract * * page 2, column 1, line 28 - page 5, column 8, line 39 * [A] 8,9,15,16;
 [YA]US3941317  (KANOR STEVEN E) [Y] 1-3,5,6,10,12-14 * abstract * * column 1, line 56 - column 4, line 64 * [A] 4,9,15;
 [A]US4350768  (TIHON CLAUDE, et al) [A] 1-16 * abstract * * column 2, line 4 - column 6, line 6 *;
 [A]GB2100137  (COULTER ELECTRONICS) [A] 1,15 * abstract * * page 1, line 53 - page 2, line 86 *