Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0983131

EP0983131 - SHAVING SYSTEMS AND FOILS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.10.2001
Database last updated on 15.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 28.11.2001 [2001/48]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Braun GmbH
Frankfurter Strasse 145
61476 Kronberg / DE
[2000/10]
Inventor(s)01 / PACKHAM, Charles, C.
35 Old Wokingham Road
Crowthorne, Berks. RG45 6SS / GB
02 / CRICHTON, Trevor, John
The Pheasantries, Ley Hill
Chesham, Bucks. HP5 3QR / GB
[2000/10]
Representative(s)(deleted)
...
[2000/27]
Former [2000/10]HOFFMANN - EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Application number, filing date98925512.030.04.1998
[2000/10]
WO1998EP02569
Priority number, dateGB1997000884730.04.1997         Original published format: GB 9708847
GB1997000884830.04.1997         Original published format: GB 9708848
[2000/10]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9848983
Date:05.11.1998
Language:EN
[1998/44]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0983131
Date:08.03.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.11.1998
[2000/10]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0983131
Date:06.12.2000
Language:EN
[2000/49]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP05.11.1998
ClassificationInternational:B26B19/38, C25D1/08
[2000/10]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL [2000/10]
TitleGerman:RASIERSYSTEME UND BLÄTTER[2000/10]
English:SHAVING SYSTEMS AND FOILS[2000/10]
French:SYSTEMES ET FEUILLES METALLIQUES DE RASAGE[2000/10]
Entry into regional phase19.10.1999National basic fee paid 
19.10.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
19.10.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.10.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
19.10.1999Examination requested  [2000/10]
19.04.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
25.05.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.07.2000Fee for grant paid
21.07.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)07.09.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/48]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[AD]JPH07646  ;
 [A]US5473818  (OTSUKA KIYOTAKA [JP], et al) [A] 1,11,16,17 * column 4, line 33 - line 60; figures 1,2 *;
 [DA]WO9319887  (GILLETTE CO [US], et al) [DA] 22,32 * page 16, line 9 - line 34 * * page 18, line 17 - line 33; figure 8 *;
 [A]JPS5985882
 [AD]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950531), vol. 095, no. 004, [AD] 1,11,16,17,22 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19840905), vol. 008, no. 193, Database accession no. (C - 241), [A] 22 * abstract *
ExaminationJP59085882
    PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 008, no. 193 (C-241), 5 September 1984 & JP 59 085882 A (KIYUSHIYU HITACHI MAKUSERU KK), 17 May 1984,