Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0984964

EP0984964 - PYRIDYLTHIO-DITHIAZOLE DERIVATIVES ADN THEIR USE AS PEST CONTROL AGENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  01.06.2001
Database last updated on 20.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip01.06.2001Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 18.07.2001 [2001/29]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BAYER AG
51368 Leverkusen / DE
[2000/11]
Inventor(s)01 / UHR, Hermann
Bodelschwinghstrasse 12
D-47800 Krefeld / DE
02 / KUGLER, Martin
Am Kloster 47
D-42799 Leichlingen / DE
03 / WACHTLER, Peter
Morgengraben 4
D-51061 Köln / DE
04 / HÄNSSLER, Gerd
Am Arenzberg 58a
D-51381 Leverkusen / DE
05 / STENZEL, Klaus
Seesener Strasse 17
D-40595 Düsseldorf / DE
[2000/11]
Application number, filing date98925575.712.05.1998
[2000/11]
WO1998EP02754
Priority number, dateDE199712162723.05.1997         Original published format: DE 19721627
[2000/11]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9852945
Date:26.11.1998
Language:DE
[1998/47]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0984964
Date:15.03.2000
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.11.1998
[2000/11]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP26.11.1998
ClassificationInternational:C07D417/12, C07D417/14, A01N43/82, A01N43/88, C07D285/01, C07D285/15
[2000/11]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IE,   IT,   LI,   NL,   PT [2000/11]
TitleGerman:PYRIDYLTHIO-DITHIAZOLDIOXID-DERIVATE UND IHRE VERWENDUNG ALS SCHÄDLINGSBEKÄMPFUNGSMITTEL[2000/11]
English:PYRIDYLTHIO-DITHIAZOLE DERIVATIVES ADN THEIR USE AS PEST CONTROL AGENTS[2000/11]
French:DERIVES DE PYRIDYLTHIO-DITHIAZOLDIOXYDE ET LEUR UTILISATION COMME AGENTS DE LUTTE CONTRE LES PARASITES[2000/11]
Entry into regional phase23.12.1999National basic fee paid 
23.12.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
23.12.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.07.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
23.12.1999Examination requested  [2000/11]
28.05.2001Application withdrawn by applicant  [2001/29]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[A]DE2608488  (CIBA GEIGY AG) [A] 1-11 * siehe das ganze Dokument, insbesondere Seite 3, Formel Ic, sowie Beispiel 3 *;
 [A]US4962102  (BECK GUNTHER [DE], et al) [A] 1-11 * column W *;
 [DPX]WO9720830  (BAYER AG [DE], et al) [DPX] 1-11 * the whole document *;
 [DX]  - NAKAHASHI K ET AL, "Synthesis of the new 1,4,2-dithiazine 1,1-dioxides", BULLETIN OF THE CHEMICAL SOCIETY OF JAPAN, Tokyo, JP, (197210), vol. 45, no. 10, pages 3217 - 8, XP002076372 [DX] 10 * siehe das ganze Dokument, insbesondere Seite 3218, Tabelle 2, Verbindung 6 *