Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0993557

EP0993557 - SPREADER ROLL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.07.2005
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip14.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT, PT
published on 16.04.2008  [2008/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Suomen Intech OY
Ollinmäentie 43
86110 Parhalahti / FI
[2000/16]
Inventor(s)01 / VESTERLUND, Ingmar
Kaukontie 28
FIN-86100 Pyhäjoki / FI
[2000/16]
Representative(s)Kupiainen, Juhani Kalervo , et al
Berggren Oy Ab
Lentokatu 2
90460 Oulunsalo / FI
[N/P]
Former [2004/18]Kupiainen, Juhani Kalervo , et al
Berggren Oy Ab Lentokatu 2
90460 Oulunsalo / FI
Former [2000/16]Järveläinen, Pertti Tauno Juhani , et al
Oy Heinänen Ab, Annankatu 31-33 C
00100 Helsinki / FI
Application number, filing date98925680.516.06.1998
[2000/16]
WO1998FI00517
Priority number, dateFI1997000288707.07.1997         Original published format: FI 972887
[2000/16]
Filing languageSV
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9902872
Date:21.01.1999
Language:EN
[1999/03]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0993557
Date:19.04.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.01.1999
[2000/16]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0993557
Date:25.08.2004
Language:EN
[2004/35]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE21.01.1999
ClassificationInternational:F16C13/02
[2000/16]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/16]
TitleGerman:BREITSTRECKWALZE[2000/16]
English:SPREADER ROLL[2000/16]
French:ROULEAU DEPLISSEUR[2000/16]
Entry into regional phase16.06.1998Translation filed 
04.02.2000National basic fee paid 
04.02.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
04.02.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.01.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE
04.02.2000Examination requested  [2000/16]
20.01.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.05.2004Fee for grant paid
12.05.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)26.05.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/33]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
12.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
11.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
22.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
21.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIT25.08.2004
NL25.08.2004
DK25.11.2004
GR25.11.2004
PT25.01.2005
[2008/16]
Former [2006/14]NL25.08.2004
DK25.11.2004
GR25.11.2004
Former [2005/22]DK25.11.2004
GR25.11.2004
Former [2005/18]GR25.11.2004
Cited inInternational search[A]DE4124651  ;
 [A]US3918774  (NICHOLSON CHARLES B)