Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0994922

EP0994922 - METHOD FOR CONTINUOUS PRODUCTION OF MODIFIED BITUMINOUS MATERIALS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  15.10.2010
Database last updated on 26.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.10.2010Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 17.11.2010  [2010/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Lopez, Emile
14-4, cours du Jardin Public
64270 Salies de Bearn / FR
[2000/17]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[2000/17]
Representative(s)Fantin, Laurent , et al
Aquinov
Allée de la Forestière
33750 Beychac et Caillau / FR
[N/P]
Former [2006/30]Fantin, Laurent , et al
AQUINOV Allée de la Forestière
33750 Beychac et Caillau / FR
Former [2003/44]Fantin, Laurent
Société AQUINOV 12, rue Condorcet
33150 Cenon / FR
Former [2002/16](deleted)
...
Former [2000/17]Thébault, Jean-Louis , et al
Cabinet Thébault 111 cours du Médoc
33300 Bordeaux / FR
Application number, filing date98925705.014.05.1998
[2000/17]
WO1998FR00956
Priority number, dateES1997000117629.05.1997         Original published format: ES 9701176
[2000/17]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9854263
Date:03.12.1998
Language:FR
[1998/48]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0994922
Date:26.04.2000
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.12.1998
[2000/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP03.12.1998
ClassificationInternational:C08L95/00, E01C23/06, C08K3/06, C08K5/36
[2000/17]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   LI,   NL,   PT [2000/17]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR KONTINUIERLICHEN HERSTELLUNG VON MODIFIZIERTEM BITUMEN[2000/17]
English:METHOD FOR CONTINUOUS PRODUCTION OF MODIFIED BITUMINOUS MATERIALS[2000/17]
French:PROCEDE DE FABRICATION EN CONTINU DE BITUMES MODIFIES[2000/17]
Entry into regional phase08.12.1999National basic fee paid 
08.12.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
08.12.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.12.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
08.12.1999Examination requested  [2000/17]
15.03.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.07.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.09.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
21.03.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.05.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
02.12.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.10.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
14.04.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.04.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
31.01.2007Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
27.03.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.10.2009Date of oral proceedings
26.11.2009Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
27.11.2009Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
08.10.2010Application withdrawn by applicant  [2010/46]
11.10.2010Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 12.10.2010
12.10.2010Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
Appeal following examination26.01.2010Appeal received
26.03.2010Statement of grounds filed
04.05.2010Interlocutory revision of appeal
Request for further processing for:27.03.2007Request for further processing filed
26.03.2007Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
13.04.2007Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
18.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
05.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
27.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
21.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
31.05.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
30.05.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
25.05.2007Renewal fee patent year 10
27.11.2008Renewal fee patent year 11
20.11.2009Renewal fee patent year 12
31.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 13
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
13.01.2000GB   M01   Fee paid on   08.02.2000
13.01.2000GR   M01   Fee paid on   08.02.2000
13.01.2000IT   M01   Fee paid on   08.02.2000
13.01.2000NL   M01   Fee paid on   08.02.2000
13.01.2000PT   M01   Fee paid on   08.02.2000
Additional fee for renewal fee
21.06.200205   M06   Fee paid on   26.06.2002
31.05.200811   M06   Fee paid on   27.11.2008
31.05.200912   M06   Fee paid on   20.11.2009
Cited inInternational search[Y]DE2105779  (T. GOLDSCHMIDT) [Y] 1-26 * page 2, line 6 - page 4, line 10 *;
 [Y]DE4424291  (LEUNA WERKE GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-26 * the whole document *;
 [Y]EP0448425  (INST FRANCAIS DU PETROLE [FR]) [Y] 1-26 * the whole document *;
 [Y]US3338849  (JOHNSON THOMAS A) [Y] 1-26 * the whole document *;
 [Y]FR2057785  (HUELS CHEMISCHE WERKE AG) [Y] 1-26 * page 5, line 17 - page 6, line 15 * * claims 5,14-18 * * page 10, line 12 - page 11, line 36 *;
 [Y]EP0360656  (ELF FRANCE [FR]) [Y] 1-26 * page 2, line 45 - page 5, line 11 *;
 [Y]FR2625519  (FRANCE LITTORAL SA ROUTE [FR]) [Y] 1,21-26 * the whole document *;
 [Y]EP0081194  (SCHOLKOPF WALTER) [Y] 1,21-26 * figure 1; claim - *