Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0983216

EP0983216 - METHOD FOR THE SYNTHESIS OF PERFLUOROSULPHONAMIDES, PERFLUOROSULPHONAMIDES AND THEIR SALTS, AND A SULPHONATION REAGENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.06.2007
Database last updated on 17.07.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip01.01.2010Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 03.02.2010  [2010/05]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
RHODIA CHIMIE
25, quai Paul Doumer
92408 Courbevoie Cédex / FR
[2000/10]
Inventor(s)01 / PEVERE, Virginie
37, rue Bataille
F-69008 Lyon / FR
02 / MARX, Emmanuel
Hameau de Boyeux
F-69380 Châtillon d'Azergues / FR
03 / GILBERT, Laurent
139, Grande rue de la Guillotière
F-69007 Lyon / FR
[2000/10]
Representative(s)Dutruc-Rosset, Marie-Claude , et al
Rhodia Services
Direction Propriété Industrielle
40, Rue de la Haie-Coq
93306 Aubervilliers Cedex / FR
[N/P]
Former [2006/11]Dutruc-Rosset, Marie-Claude , et al
Rhodia Services, Direction de la Propriété Industrielle, 40, rue de la Haie-Coq
93306 Aubervilliers Cedex / FR
Former [2005/11]Esson, Jean-Pierre , et al
Rhodia Services, Direction de la Propriété Industrielle, Crit-Carrières, B.P. 62
69192 Saint-Fons Cédex / FR
Former [2000/10]Ricalens, François , et al
Rhodia Services, 25, quai Paul Doumer
92408 Courbevoie Cedex / FR
Application number, filing date98925721.715.05.1998
[2000/10]
WO1998FR00973
Priority number, dateFR1997000606416.05.1997         Original published format: FR 9706064
[2000/10]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9852886
Date:26.11.1998
Language:FR
[1998/47]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0983216
Date:08.03.2000
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.11.1998
[2000/10]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0983216
Date:02.08.2006
Language:FR
[2006/31]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP26.11.1998
ClassificationInternational:C07B45/00, C07C303/38, C07C311/48
[2000/10]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/10]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON PERFLUORSULFONAMIDEN, PERFLUORSULFONAMIDEN UND IHREN SALZEN, SOWIE EIN SULFONIERUNGSREAGENS[2006/05]
English:METHOD FOR THE SYNTHESIS OF PERFLUOROSULPHONAMIDES, PERFLUOROSULPHONAMIDES AND THEIR SALTS, AND A SULPHONATION REAGENT[2000/10]
French:PROCEDE DE SYNTHESE DE PERFLUOROSULFONAMIDES, DE PERFLUOROSULFONAMIDES ET DE LEURS SELS, AINSI QU'UN REACTIF DE SULFONYLATON[2006/05]
Former [2000/10]VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON PERFLUORSULFONAMIDEN, PERFLUOSULFONIMIDEN UND IHREN SALZEN, SOWIE EIN SULFONIERUNGSREAGENS
Former [2000/10]PROCEDE DE SYNTHESE DE PERFLUOROSULFONAMIDES, DE PERFLUOROSULFONIMIDES ET DE LEURS SELS, AINSI QU'UN REACTIF DE SULFONYLATON
Entry into regional phase01.11.1999National basic fee paid 
01.11.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
01.11.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.12.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
01.11.1999Examination requested  [2000/10]
25.06.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
07.02.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
20.02.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.01.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.04.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.12.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.04.2006Fee for grant paid
26.04.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)03.05.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/28]
Request for further processing for:20.02.2003Request for further processing filed
20.02.2003Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
07.03.2003Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
18.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
14.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
13.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
13.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
12.05.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
10.05.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT02.08.2006
CY02.08.2006
FI02.08.2006
IE02.08.2006
NL02.08.2006
DK02.11.2006
SE02.11.2006
GR03.11.2006
PT02.01.2007
[2010/05]
Former [2008/21]AT02.08.2006
FI02.08.2006
IE02.08.2006
NL02.08.2006
DK02.11.2006
SE02.11.2006
GR03.11.2006
PT02.01.2007
Former [2008/16]AT02.08.2006
FI02.08.2006
IE02.08.2006
NL02.08.2006
DK02.11.2006
SE02.11.2006
PT02.01.2007
Former [2007/29]AT02.08.2006
FI02.08.2006
IE02.08.2006
NL02.08.2006
DK02.11.2006
SE02.11.2006
PT02.01.2007
Former [2007/23]AT02.08.2006
FI02.08.2006
NL02.08.2006
DK02.11.2006
SE02.11.2006
Former [2007/22]FI02.08.2006
NL02.08.2006
DK02.11.2006
SE02.11.2006
Former [2007/21]FI02.08.2006
NL02.08.2006
SE02.11.2006
Former [2007/17]FI02.08.2006
SE02.11.2006
Cited inInternational search[DA]FR2724380  (CENTRAL GLASS CO LTD [JP]) [DA] 1 * page 1 - page 2; claim 1 *;
 [DA]WO9011999  (CENTRE NAT RECH SCIENT [FR], et al) [DA] 1 * page 3, line 33 - page 4, line 12 *;
 [DPX]WO9723448  (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [DPX] 1-3,6,7,17 * page 2 - page 4; claims 1,5,9 *
 [X]  - L.M. YAGUPOL'SKII, ET AL., "Trifluoromethylsulphonylimino and bis(trifluoromethylsulphonylimino) derivatives of arenesulphonic acids", RUSSIAN JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, New York, US, (199505), vol. 31, no. 5, pages 691 - 695, XP002051637 [X] 1-3,8,9 * page 691, column R * * page 694, column R *
 [A]  - D.D. DESMARTEAU, ET AL., "N-Fluoro-bis(trifluoromethanesulphonyl)imide. An improved synthesis", JOURNAL OF FLUORINE CHEMISTRY, LAUSANNE, CH, (199104), vol. 52, no. 1, pages 7 - 12, XP002025807 [A] 1 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0022-1139(00)80317-6
 [A]  - B. HELFERICH, ET AL., "Bis-[alkylsulfonsäure]-imide", BERICHTE DER DEUTSCHEN CHEMISCHEN GESELLSCHAFT, WEINHEIM, DE, (1942), vol. 75, pages 532 - 536, XP002025808 [A] 1 * the whole document *