Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0987946

EP0987946 - BIOCIDAL ORGANIC ACID SALTS OF A POLYMERIC BIGUANIDE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  26.09.2003
Database last updated on 17.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip14.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 16.04.2008  [2008/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Avecia Limited
Hexagon House
Blackley, Manchester M9 8ZS / GB
[2000/13]
Inventor(s)01 / WOOLLVEN, Peter
Earls Road, Grangemouth
Stirlingshire FK3 8XG / GB
[2000/13]
Representative(s)Fawkes, David Melville , et al
AVECIA Limited, Intellectual Property Group, P.O. Box 42, Hexagon House Blackley
Manchester M9 8ZS / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/13]Fawkes, David Melville , et al
AVECIA Limited, Intellectual Property Group, P.O. Box 42, Hexagon House
Blackley, Manchester M9 8ZS / GB
Application number, filing date98925853.805.06.1998
[2000/13]
WO1998GB01662
Priority number, dateGB1997001231713.06.1997         Original published format: GB 9712317
[2000/13]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9856253
Date:17.12.1998
Language:EN
[1998/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0987946
Date:29.03.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.12.1998
[2000/13]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0987946
Date:20.11.2002
Language:EN
[2002/47]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP17.12.1998
ClassificationInternational:A01N47/44, C08G73/00
[2000/13]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   IE,   IT,   LI,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/13]
TitleGerman:BIOZIDE ORGANISCHE-SÄURESALZE EINES POLYMEREN BIGUANIDS[2000/13]
English:BIOCIDAL ORGANIC ACID SALTS OF A POLYMERIC BIGUANIDE[2000/13]
French:SELS BIOCIDES D'UN ACIDE ORGANIQUE ET D'UN POLYMERE DE BIGUANIDE[2000/13]
Entry into regional phase13.01.2000National basic fee paid 
13.01.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
13.01.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.12.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
13.01.2000Examination requested  [2000/13]
17.04.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.07.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.01.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.01.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.02.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
03.05.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
06.06.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.09.2002Fee for grant paid
10.09.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)21.08.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/46]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
13.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
12.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT20.11.2002
BE20.11.2002
FI20.11.2002
IT20.11.2002
NL20.11.2002
DK20.02.2003
PT20.02.2003
SE20.02.2003
ES29.05.2003
IE05.06.2003
[2008/16]
Former [2007/17]AT20.11.2002
BE20.11.2002
FI20.11.2002
NL20.11.2002
DK20.02.2003
PT20.02.2003
SE20.02.2003
ES29.05.2003
IE05.06.2003
Former [2004/29]AT20.11.2002
BE20.11.2002
FI20.11.2002
NL20.11.2002
PT20.02.2003
SE20.02.2003
ES29.05.2003
IE05.06.2003
Former [2004/04]AT20.11.2002
BE20.11.2002
FI20.11.2002
NL20.11.2002
PT20.02.2003
SE20.02.2003
ES29.05.2003
Former [2003/51]AT20.11.2002
BE20.11.2002
FI20.11.2002
NL20.11.2002
PT20.02.2003
SE20.02.2003
Former [2003/43]AT20.11.2002
FI20.11.2002
NL20.11.2002
PT20.02.2003
SE20.02.2003
Former [2003/37]AT20.11.2002
NL20.11.2002
PT20.02.2003
SE20.02.2003
Former [2003/30]NL20.11.2002
PT20.02.2003
SE20.02.2003
Former [2003/29]PT20.02.2003
SE20.02.2003
Former [2003/19]SE20.02.2003
Cited inInternational search[X]GB1434040  (ICI LTD) [X] 1-14 * claim - * * page 5, line 26 - line 39 * * page 28 *;
 [X]BE698595  (ICI) [X] 1-14 * claims 6,7 *;
 [X]GB843676  (ICI LTD) [X] 1,2,6-11,13,14 * claim - *;
 [X]WO9526134  (UNIV COLUMBIA [US], et al) [X] 1,2,6-11,14 * claim 6 *;
 [X]JPS63183502  ;
 [X]JPH08119878
 [X]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 88, no. 36, Database accession no. 88-253361, XP002081248 & JPS63183502 A 19870622 (UENO SEIYAKU OYO KENKYUSHO KK) [X] 1-6,9-12 * abstract *
 [X]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 96, no. 29, Database accession no. 96-283427, XP002081249 & JPH08119878 A 19960514 (LION CORP) [X] 1,2,6-11,13,14 * abstract *