EP0988119 - METAL STRIP PRODUCTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 30.11.2001 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2001 | Withdrawal of application | published on 16.01.2002 [2002/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states POSCO ENGINEERING & CONSTRUCTION CO. LTD. 568-1 Koedong-Dong Pohang City Kyongsangbuk-Do 790-300 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2000/20] | For all designated states POSCO ENGINEERING & CONSTRUCTION CO. LTD. 568-1 Koedong-Dong Pohang City, Kyongsangbuk-Do 790-300 / KR | ||
Former [2000/13] | For all designated states Posec-Europe Limited Distington House, 26 Atlas Way Sheffield S4 7QQ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAYNES, Ralph, Gladwin 6 Castle Green, Laughton-en-le-Morthen Sheffield S25 1YY / GB | [2000/13] | Representative(s) | Hulse, Thomas Arnold, et al Hulse & Co St. James House 2nd Floor Vicar Lane Sheffield S1 2EX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/13] | Hulse, Thomas Arnold, et al Hulse & Co, St. James House, 8th Floor, Vicar Lane Sheffield S1 2EX / GB | Application number, filing date | 98925854.6 | 05.06.1998 | [2000/13] | WO1998GB01663 | Priority number, date | GB19970012010 | 09.06.1997 Original published format: GB 9712010 | [2000/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9856517 | Date: | 17.12.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0988119 | Date: | 29.03.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.12.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.12.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B21B1/46, C21D9/00 | [2000/13] | CPC: |
B21B1/46 (KR);
B21B1/466 (EP);
C21D9/0081 (EP);
F27D3/0024 (EP);
B21B45/004 (EP);
C21D9/0018 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2000/13] | Title | German: | METALLBANDHERSTELLUNG | [2000/13] | English: | METAL STRIP PRODUCTION | [2000/13] | French: | PRODUCTION DE BANDES METALLIQUES | [2000/13] | Entry into regional phase | 03.12.1999 | National basic fee paid | 03.12.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.12.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.11.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 03.12.1999 | Examination requested [2000/13] | 20.06.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.11.2001 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2002/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YA]FR2656680 (STEIN HEURTEY [FR]) [Y] 1,2,4 * page 3 - page 6; figures 1-6 * [A] 3; | [Y]DE3707562 (SCHLOEMANN SIEMAG AG [DE]) [Y] 1,2,4 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2672378 (STEIN HEURTEY [FR]) [A] 1-5 * page 3 - page 8; figures 1-3 *; | [A]EP0665296 (INNOCENTI ENG SPA [IT]) [A] 1,3,4 * column 3 - column 5; figures 1,2 *; | [A]DE3908457 (LOI IND OFENANLAGEN [DE]) [A] 1,3,4 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0413169 (SCHLOEMANN SIEMAG AG [DE]) [A] 1,3,4 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0662358 (TIPPINS INC [US]) [A] 1,4,5 * page 5; figure 2 *; | [A]US3648359 (DENNIS WILLIAM E) [A] 1,2 * column 2; figure 1 *; | [A]EP0302257 (DANIELI OFF MECC [IT]) [A] 1,4 * column 3 - column 5; figure - * | [A] - FLICK A, "CURRENT REPORT ON VAI CONROLL TECHNOLOGY", STEEL TIMES - INCORPORATING IRON & STEEL, (19920201), vol. 220, no. 2, page 80, 82, 84, XP000248767 [A] 1-5 * page 84; figure 7 * | [A] - CONE C, "REHEATING FURNACES FOR CONTINUOUS STEELMAKING", IRON AND STEEL ENGINEER., PITTSBURGH US, (196709), vol. 44, no. 9, pages 119 - 126, XP002078938 [A] 1,2,4,5 * page 122 - page 123; figures 6,9 * |