Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1015122

EP1015122 - FILTER FOR SEPARATING PARTICLES FROM AIR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  25.04.2003
Database last updated on 23.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip25.04.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 11.06.2003  [2003/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
FRESHMAN AB
Ritarslingan 16 B
187 66 Täby / SE
[2000/27]
Inventor(s)01 / VON GLEHN, Andreas
Stockholmsvägen 109
SE-182 61 Djursholm / SE
[2000/27]
Representative(s)Johansson, Lars E.
Dr. Ludwig Brann Patentbyra AB P.O. Box 171 92
104 62 Stockholm / SE
[N/P]
Former [2000/27]Johansson, Lars E.
Lars Johansson Patentbyra AB P.O. Box 68
801 02 Gävle / SE
Application number, filing date98926002.122.05.1998
[2000/27]
WO1998SE00966
Priority number, dateSE1997000203530.05.1997         Original published format: SE 9702035
[2000/27]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9853915
Date:03.12.1998
Language:EN
[1998/48]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1015122
Date:05.07.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.12.1998
[2000/27]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE03.12.1998
ClassificationInternational:B03C3/30, // B01D46/28
[2000/27]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL [2000/27]
TitleGerman:LUFTFILTER ZUM TRENNEN VON TEILCHEN[2000/27]
English:FILTER FOR SEPARATING PARTICLES FROM AIR[2000/27]
French:FILTRE DE SEPARATION DESTINE A PIEGER DES PARTICULES CONTENUES DANS DE L'AIR[2000/27]
Entry into regional phase16.12.1999National basic fee paid 
16.12.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
16.12.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.12.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE
16.12.1999Examination requested  [2000/27]
03.12.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/24]
09.01.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2003/24]
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.12.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
21.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.200205   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[A]WO9500248  (FRESHMAN AB [SE], et al);
 [A]SU1125053
 [A]  - DERWENT'S ABSTRACT, No. 85-139861/23, Week 8523; & SU,A,1 125 053 (AS UKR PHYS ORG CHEM) 23 November 1984.,