Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0994708

EP0994708 - ANTAGONISTS OF GONADOTROPIN RELEASING HORMONE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  13.06.2003
Database last updated on 20.10.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip05.06.2009Change - representativepublished on 08.07.2009  [2009/28]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Merck & Co., Inc.
126 East Lincoln Avenue
Rahway, New Jersey 07065 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/17]For all designated states
MERCK & CO., INC.
126 East Lincoln Avenue
Rahway, New Jersey 07065 / US
Inventor(s)01 / GOULET, Mark
126 East Lincoln Avenue
Rahway, NJ 07065 / US
02 / WYVRATT, Matthew, J., Jr.
126 East Lincoln Avenue
Rahway, NJ 07065 / US
03 / CHU, Lin
126 East Lincoln Avenue
Rahway, NJ 07065 / US
04 / GIROTRA, Narindar, N.
126 East Lincoln Avenue
Rahway, NJ 07065 / US
05 / LIN, Peter
126 East Lincoln Avenue
Rahway, NJ 07065 / US
[2000/17]
Representative(s)Horgan, James Michael Frederic , et al
Merck & Co., Inc.
European Patent Department
Terlings Park
Eastwick Road, Harlow
Essex CM20 2QR / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/28]Horgan, James Michael Frederic , et al
Merck & Co., Inc. European Patent Department Terlings Park Eastwick Road Harlow
Essex CM20 2QR / GB
Former [2000/17]Horgan, James Michael Frederic , et al
Merck & Co., Inc., Terlings Park, Eastwick Road
Harlow, Essex CM20 2QR / GB
Application number, filing date98926173.001.06.1998
[2000/17]
WO1998US11208
Priority number, dateUS19970048638P05.06.1997         Original published format: US 48638 P
US19970048642P05.06.1997         Original published format: US 48642 P
GB1997001984018.09.1997         Original published format: GB 9719840
GB1998000045409.01.1998         Original published format: GB 9800454
[2000/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9855123
Date:10.12.1998
Language:EN
[1998/49]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0994708
Date:26.04.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.12.1998
[2000/17]
Search report(s)International search reportUS10.12.1998
ClassificationInternational:A61K31/44, C07D213/73, C07D407/06
[2000/17]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/17]
TitleGerman:ANTAGONISTEN DES GONADOTROPIN FREISETZENDEN HORMONES[2000/17]
English:ANTAGONISTS OF GONADOTROPIN RELEASING HORMONE[2000/17]
French:ANTAGONISTES DE L'HORMONE DE LIBERATION DE LA GONADOTROPHINE[2000/17]
Entry into regional phase05.01.2000National basic fee paid 
05.01.2000Search fee paid 
05.01.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
05.01.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.12.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
05.01.2000Examination requested  [2000/17]
03.01.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/31]
13.02.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2003/31]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
02.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.200205   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[Y]US4252803  (WEBB COLIN F);
 [Y]US4943572  (VON ANGERER ERWIN [DE])