blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0990373 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0990373



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 72
27.03.2001 Closing of application Search / examination 2
12.12.2000 Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) Search / examination 1
07.07.2000 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
07.07.2000 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
23.02.2000 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
06.12.1999 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
04.03.1999 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
07.01.1999 Priority document Search / examination 28
10.12.1998 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
10.12.1998 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 26