blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0990373


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
25.07.2008 Change - representative published on  27.08.2008  [2008/35]
23.03.2001 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  09.05.2001 [2001/19]
07.12.2000 Application deemed to be withdrawn
07.07.2000 First examination report
04.07.2000 Examination report or reply
31.05.2000 Renewal fee
18.02.2000 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  05.04.2000 [2000/14]
18.02.2000 Request for examination filed published on  05.04.2000 [2000/14]
13.01.2000 PCT data prior to European publication
20.12.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
03.03.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
18.11.1998 PCT data prior to European publication
30.09.1998 PCT data prior to European publication