blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0990373
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP0990373Global Dossier 05.04.2000A1
Priority number Date
JP15492897 12.06.1997
US9811321 08.06.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU7809198 30.12.1998A
Priority number Date
JP15492897 12.06.1997
US9811321 08.06.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US6617784 09.09.2003B1
Priority number Date
US42472299 30.11.1999
US9811321 08.06.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO9857525Global Dossier 17.12.1998A1
Priority number Date
JP15492897 12.06.1997
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
JPH118063Global Dossier 12.01.1999A
Priority number Date
JP15492897 12.06.1997