blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP0990373

Designated contracting statesDE 
GB 
Examination procedure18.01.2001Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2001/19]
Entry into regional phase28.12.1999National basic fee paid 
28.12.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
28.12.1999Examination fee paid 
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:05.04.2000 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A1
Designated State(s):DE GB
 
Event date:05.04.2000 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:19991228
 
Event date:23.08.2000 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:20000707
 
Event date:09.05.2001 
Event description:APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN
Effective DATE:20010118