Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0990373

EP0990373 - ELECTOLUMINESCENT DEVICE AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  23.03.2001
Database last updated on 19.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.07.2008Change - representativepublished on 27.08.2008  [2008/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY
3M Center, P.O. Box 33427
St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/14]For all designated states
MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY
3M Center, P.O. Box 33427
St. Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US
Inventor(s)01 / ABE, Hidetoshi
11-32, Ekinishi 1-chome
Tendo-city Yamagata Pref. 994-0047 / JP
02 / ARAKI, Yoshinori
3-9-19, Motomachi
Sage-city Yamagata-city 991-0053 / JP
[2000/14]
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/35]Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
Former [2000/14]VOSSIUS & PARTNER
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date98926197.908.06.1998
[2000/14]
WO1998US11321
Priority number, dateJP1997015492812.06.1997         Original published format: JP 15492897
[2000/14]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9857525
Date:17.12.1998
Language:EN
[1998/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0990373
Date:05.04.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.12.1998
[2000/14]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP17.12.1998
ClassificationInternational:H05B33/12, H05B33/02, H05B33/10, H05B33/14
[2000/14]
Designated contracting statesDE,   GB [2000/14]
TitleGerman:ELEKTROLUMINESZIERENDE VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DERSELBEN[2000/14]
English:ELECTOLUMINESCENT DEVICE AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING THE SAME[2000/14]
French:DISPOSITIF ELECTROLUMINESCENT ET SON PROCEDE DE FABRICATION[2000/14]
Entry into regional phase28.12.1999National basic fee paid 
28.12.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
28.12.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.11.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
28.12.1999Examination requested  [2000/14]
07.07.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.12.2000Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2001/19]
18.01.2001Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2001/19]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[X]JPH0973983  ;
 [X]JPH0954171  ;
 [X]JPH0915596  ;
 [XP]JPH09326297  ;
 [A]WO8804467  (APPELBERG GUSTAF T [US]) [A] 1-3 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0323218  (LOCTITE LUMINESCENT SYST [US]) [A] 1-3 * the whole document *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970731), vol. 097, no. 007, & JP09073983 A 19970318 (SEIKO PRECISION KK) [X] 1 * abstract *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970630), vol. 097, no. 006, & JP09054171 A 19970225 (NITTO JUSHI KOGYO KK;CITIZEN WATCH CO LTD) [X] 1 * abstract *
 [X]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 97, no. 13, Database accession no. 97-136304, XP002075721 & JPH0915596 A 00000000 (SEIKOSHA KK) [X] 1 * abstract *
 [XP]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980331), vol. 098, no. 004, & JP09326297 A 19971216 (CASIO COMPUT CO LTD) [XP] 1 * abstract *