Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0990112

EP0990112 - COMPENSATION FOR UNDESIRED ANGLE DEVIATIONS ARISING DURING VEHICLE WHEEL ALIGNMENT OPERATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  31.03.2006
Database last updated on 11.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip31.03.2006Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 17.05.2006  [2006/20]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Snap-on Incorporated
10801 Corporate Drive
Pleasant Prairie, Wisconsin 53158-1603 / US
[N/P]
Former [2004/38]For all designated states
Snap-on Incorporated
10801 Corporate Drive
Pleasant Prairie, Wisconsin 53158-1603 / US
Former [2004/34]For all designated states
Snap-on Incorporated
2801-80th Street
Kenosha, Wisconsin 53141-1410 / US
Former [2004/33]For all designated states
Snap-on Incorporated
2801-80th Street
Kenosha, Wisconsin 53141-1410 / US
Former [2000/14]For all designated states
Snap-On Technologies, Inc.
420 Barclay Boulevard
Lincolnshire, IL 60069 / US
Inventor(s)01 / GILL, George, Michael
27 Stump Street
Vilonia, AR 72173 / US
02 / O'MAHONY, Patrick, Brendan
12 Ashton Park Blackrock Road
Cork / IE
03 / WALCHUK, Donald
2 Hyde Park
Conway, AR 72032 / US
[2000/14]
Representative(s)Rutetzki, Andreas
Müller-Boré & Partner
Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Grafinger Strasse 2
81671 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/14]Rutetzki, Andreas, Dipl.-Ing.
Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2
81671 München / DE
Application number, filing date98926279.503.06.1998
[2000/14]
WO1998US11511
Priority number, dateUS1997086874104.06.1997         Original published format: US 868741
[2000/14]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9855827
Date:10.12.1998
Language:EN
[1998/49]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0990112
Date:05.04.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.12.1998
[2000/14]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US10.12.1998
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.01.2002
ClassificationInternational:G01B5/24, G01B7/30, G01B21/26
[2002/10]
Former International [2000/14]G01B5/24, G01B7/30
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   IT [2000/14]
TitleGerman:KOMPENSATION FÜR UNERWÜNSCHTE, WÄHREND DER FAHRZEUGRADEINSTELLUNG AUFTRETENDE WINKELABWEICHUNGEN[2005/29]
English:COMPENSATION FOR UNDESIRED ANGLE DEVIATIONS ARISING DURING VEHICLE WHEEL ALIGNMENT OPERATIONS[2000/14]
French:COMPENSATION DES DEVIATIONS D'ANGLE NON DESIREES SURVENANT AU COURS DES OPERATIONS D'ALIGNEMENT DES ROUES D'UN VEHICULE[2005/29]
Former [2000/14]KOMPENSATION FÜR UNERWÜNSCHTEN WINCKELABWEICHUNGEN AUFKOMMEND WÄHREND KRAFTWAGENRADALIGNIERUNGSOPERATION
Former [2000/14]COMPENSATION DES DEVIATIONS NON DESIREES SURVENANT AU COURS DES OPERATIONS DE REGLAGE DE LA GEOMETRIE D'UN VEHICULE
Entry into regional phase09.12.1999National basic fee paid 
09.12.1999Search fee paid 
09.12.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
09.12.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.12.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
09.12.1999Examination requested  [2000/14]
04.08.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.12.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.06.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
23.12.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.07.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.11.2005Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2006/20]
21.12.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2006/20]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
23.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
24.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
23.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
23.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
21.06.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[XY]US5301110  (SPAINHOUR PHILLIP A [US], et al) [X] 23 * column 1, line 18 - line 22 * * column 2, line 31 - line 41 * * claim 1 * * figures 1,2 * [Y] 1-10,14,16-18,24;
 [Y]US5513439  (BRAUER STEPHEN F [US], et al) [Y] 1-3,8-10,14,16,18 * claim 14 * * figures 1,2 *;
 [Y]US5311668  (LONGA SIMONE [IT], et al) [Y] 4-7,17,24 * column 1, line 35 - line 46 * * column 1, line 63 - line 68 * * claim 8 * * figure 1 *;
 [A]FR2356122  (MONIOT PHILIPPE [FR]) [A] 1-24 * claim 1 *;
 [AD]US4180915  (LILL MELVIN H [US], et al) [AD] 1-24 * the whole document *
International search[X]US5014227  (KLING MICHAEL J [US], et al);
 [Y]US5335420  (KLING III MICHAEL J [US], et al);
 [A]US4381548  (GROSSMAN JAMES M, et al);
 [A]US4143970  (LILL MELVIN H)