Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0997038

EP0997038 - INTERACTIVE PROGRAM GUIDE NAVIGATOR MENU SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2000/18]INTERACTIVE PROGRAM GUIDE NAVIGATOR
[2001/15]
StatusOpposition rejected
Status updated on  01.06.2007
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip01.06.2007Opposition rejectedpublished on 04.07.2007  [2007/27]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
United Video Properties Inc.
7140 South Lewis Avenue Tulsa
Oklahoma 74136-5422 / US
[N/P]
Former [2002/34]For all designated states
United Video Properties Inc.
7140 South Lewis Avenue
Tulsa, Oklahoma 74136-5422 / US
Former [2000/18]For all designated states
United Video Properties, Inc.
7140 South Lewis Avenue
Tulsa, OK 74136 / US
Inventor(s)01 / ALLISON, Donald, Wayne
3411 South 132nd East Avenue
Tulsa, OK 74134 / US
02 / WILLIAMSON, Steven, Carl
2720 S. Elder Avenue
Broken Arrow, OK 74012 / US
03 / HERRINGTON, Walter, Benjamin
725 W. 20th Street
Tulsa, OK 74107 / US
[2000/18]
Representative(s)Hale, Peter , et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP
Lacon London
84 Theobalds Road
London WC1X 8NL / GB
[N/P]
Former [2001/35]Hale, Peter , et al
Kilburn & Strode 20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PJ / GB
Former [2000/18]VOSSIUS & PARTNER
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date98926431.209.06.1998
[2000/18]
WO1998US11841
Priority number, dateUS1997088952608.07.1997         Original published format: US 889526
[2000/18]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9903271
Date:21.01.1999
Language:EN
[1999/03]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0997038
Date:03.05.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.01.1999
[2000/18]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0997038
Date:18.09.2002
Language:EN
[2002/38]
Search report(s)International search reportEP21.01.1999
ClassificationInternational:H04N5/445
[2000/18]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/18]
TitleGerman:INTERAKTIVER PRPGRAMMFÜHRERNAVIGATOR[2004/26]
English:INTERACTIVE PROGRAM GUIDE NAVIGATOR MENU SYSTEM[2001/15]
French:SYSTEME DE NAVIGATION INTERACTIF POUR GUIDE DE PROGRAMMES PAR MENUS[2001/37]
Former [2000/18]INTERAKTIVER PRPGRAMMFÜHRERNAVIGATOR
Former [2000/18]INTERACTIVE PROGRAM GUIDE NAVIGATOR
Former [2000/18]NAVIGATEUR DE GUIDE DE PROGRAMMES INTERACTIF
Entry into regional phase22.12.1999National basic fee paid 
22.12.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
22.12.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.01.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
22.12.1999Examination requested  [2000/18]
31.07.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
05.02.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.08.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
05.12.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.03.2002Fee for grant paid
01.03.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  13.06.2003  21.07.2003  ADMISSIBLE
IGR GmbH & Co. KG.
Bahnstrasse 62
40210 Düsseldorf / DE
Opponent's representative
Eichstädt, Alfred
Maryniok GbR
Patent- und Rechtsanwaltssozietät
Leibnizstrasse 6
95447 Bayreuth / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2007/08]
Opponent(s)01  13.06.2003  21.07.2003  ADMISSIBLE
IGR GmbH & Co. KG.
Bahnstrasse 62
40210 Düsseldorf / DE
Opponent's representative
Eichstädt, Alfred
Maryniok & Partner, Kuhbergstrasse 23
96317 Kronach / DE
Former [2003/32]
Opponent(s)01  13.06.2003   
Interessengemeinschaft für Rundfunkschutzrechte GmbH Schutzrechtsverwertung & Co. KG
Bahnstrasse 62
40210 Düsseldorf / DE
Opponent's representative
Eichstädt, Alfred, Dipl.-Ing.
Maryniok & Partner, Kuhbergstrasse 23
96317 Kronach / DE
28.07.2003Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
28.01.2004Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
24.05.2004Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
13.04.2007Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2007/27]
Appeal following opposition19.07.2004Appeal received No.  T0935/04
24.09.2004Statement of grounds filed
13.04.2007Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent withdrawn
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
29.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
12.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT18.09.2002
CH18.09.2002
FI18.09.2002
GR18.09.2002
LI18.09.2002
DK18.12.2002
SE18.12.2002
PT19.12.2002
CY09.06.2003
IE09.06.2003
LU09.06.2003
MC30.06.2003
BE30.06.2004
NL01.01.2005
[2007/17]
Former [2006/14]AT18.09.2002
CH18.09.2002
FI18.09.2002
GR18.09.2002
LI18.09.2002
SE18.12.2002
PT19.12.2002
CY09.06.2003
IE09.06.2003
LU09.06.2003
MC30.06.2003
BE30.06.2004
NL01.01.2005
Former [2005/28]AT18.09.2002
CH18.09.2002
FI18.09.2002
GR18.09.2002
LI18.09.2002
SE18.12.2002
PT19.12.2002
CY09.06.2003
IE09.06.2003
LU09.06.2003
MC30.06.2003
BE30.06.2004
Former [2005/21]AT18.09.2002
CH18.09.2002
FI18.09.2002
GR18.09.2002
LI18.09.2002
SE18.12.2002
PT19.12.2002
CY09.06.2003
IE09.06.2003
LU09.06.2003
MC30.06.2003
Former [2005/02]AT18.09.2002
CH18.09.2002
GR18.09.2002
LI18.09.2002
SE18.12.2002
PT19.12.2002
CY09.06.2003
IE09.06.2003
LU09.06.2003
MC30.06.2003
Former [2004/39]AT18.09.2002
CH18.09.2002
GR18.09.2002
LI18.09.2002
SE18.12.2002
PT19.12.2002
CY09.06.2003
IE09.06.2003
LU09.06.2003
Former [2004/36]AT18.09.2002
CH18.09.2002
GR18.09.2002
LI18.09.2002
SE18.12.2002
PT19.12.2002
CY09.06.2003
IE09.06.2003
Former [2004/29]AT18.09.2002
CH18.09.2002
GR18.09.2002
LI18.09.2002
SE18.12.2002
PT19.12.2002
IE09.06.2003
Former [2003/39]AT18.09.2002
CH18.09.2002
GR18.09.2002
LI18.09.2002
SE18.12.2002
PT19.12.2002
Former [2003/31]AT18.09.2002
GR18.09.2002
SE18.12.2002
PT19.12.2002
Former [2003/29]GR18.09.2002
SE18.12.2002
PT19.12.2002
Former [2003/20]GR18.09.2002
SE18.12.2002
Former [2003/14]SE18.12.2002
Cited inInternational search[XAY]WO9641478  (TV GUIDE ON SCREEN [US]) [X] 1-3,6,7,9,10,12-14,17,18,20,21 * page 22, line 25 - page 23, line 30; figures 6,15-17 * * page 24, line 1 - line 34; figures 18,25 * [A] 4,8,11,15,19,22 [Y] 5,16;
 [YA]US5623613  (ROWE KEITH [US], et al) [Y] 5,16 * the whole document * [A] 1,2,12,13;
 [A]WO9532587  (PREVUE INTERNATIONAL INC [US]) [A] 1-22 * page 5, line 27 - page 6, line 1; figure 3 *;
 [A]WO9713368  (STARSIGHT TELECAST INC [US], et al) [A] 1-22 * page 31, line 1 - page 32, line 36; figures 12A,12B *