Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0991766

EP0991766 - REGULATION OF QUINOLATE PHOSPHORIBOSYL TRANSFERASE EXPRESSION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  21.01.2005
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.01.2005No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 09.03.2005  [2005/10]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NORTH CAROLINA STATE UNIVERSITY
1 Holladay Hall, Box 7003
Raleigh, NC 27695-7003 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/15]For all designated states
NORTH CAROLINA STATE UNIVERSITY
1 Holladay Hall, Box 7003
Raleigh, NC 27695-7003 / US
Inventor(s)01 / CONKLING, Mark, A.
5313 April Wind Drive
Fuquay-Varina, NC 27707 / US
02 / MENDU, Nandini
5639 Chapel Hill Road 207
Durham, NC 27709 / US
03 / SONG, Wen
9616 Gold Coast Drive, No. G-8
San Diego, CA 92126 / US
[2000/15]
Representative(s)HGF Limited
1 City Walk
Leeds LS11 9DX / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/15]Harrison Goddard Foote
Belmont House, 20 Wood Lane
Leeds LS6 2AE / GB
Application number, filing date98926456.910.06.1998
[2000/15]
WO1998US11893
Priority number, dateUS19970049471P12.06.1997         Original published format: US 49471 P
[2000/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9856923
Date:17.12.1998
Language:EN
[1998/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0991766
Date:12.04.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.12.1998
[2000/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0991766
Date:17.03.2004
Language:EN
[2004/12]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP17.12.1998
ClassificationInternational:C12N15/54, C12N15/82, C12N15/70, C12N15/11, C12N9/10, C12N5/10, A01H5/00
[2000/15]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/15]
TitleGerman:REGULATION DER EXPRESSION VON CHINOLATPHOSPHORIBOSYLTRANSFERASE[2000/15]
English:REGULATION OF QUINOLATE PHOSPHORIBOSYL TRANSFERASE EXPRESSION[2000/15]
French:REGULATION DE L'EXPRESSION DE L'ENZYME QUINOLATE-PHOSPHORIBOSYL TRANSFERASE[2000/15]
Entry into regional phase02.10.1999National basic fee paid 
02.10.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
02.10.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.12.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
02.10.1999Examination requested  [2000/15]
15.12.1999Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
15.07.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.01.2004Fee for grant paid
09.01.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP04004191.5  / EP1457562
EP04004192.3  / EP1457563
Opposition(s)20.12.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2005/10]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
13.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
12.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
12.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Cited inInternational search[A]WO9305646  (TECHNOLOGY MANAGEMENT SERVICES [CH]) [A] 1-44 * the whole document *;
 [AD]WO9428142  (PHILIP MORRIS PROD [US]) [AD] 1-44 * the whole document *
 [XD]  - CONKLING M. ET AL., "Isolation of transcriptionally regulated root-specific genes from tobacco", PLANT PHYSIOLOGY, (199007), vol. 93, no. 3, pages 1203 - 1211, XP002080227 [XD] 1,14,15 * the whole document *
 [X]  - SONG, WEN, "Molecular characterizations of two tobacco root-specific genes: TobRB7 and NtQPT1.", (1997) 224 PP. AVAIL.: UMI, ORDER NO. DA9804246 FROM: DISS. ABSTR. INT., B 1998, 58(8), 4061, XP002080228 [X] 1-15 * abstract *
 [A]  - HAMILL J D ET AL, "Over-expressing a yeast ornithine decarboxylase gene in transgenic roots of Nicotiana rustica can lead to enhanced nicotine accumulation.", PLANT MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, (1990 JUL) 15 (1) 27-38. JOURNAL CODE: A6O. ISSN: 0167-4412., XP002080229 [A] 1-44 * the whole document *
 [A]  - HOLMBERG N ET AL, "Transgenic tobacco expressing Vitreoscilla hemoglobin exhibits enhanced growth and altered metabolite production [see comments].", NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1997 MAR) 15 (3) 244-7. JOURNAL CODE: CQ3. ISSN: 1087-0156., XP002080230 [A] 1-44 * the whole document *