Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1032998

EP1032998 - VOICE RECOGNITION UNIT FOR AUDIENCE MEASUREMENT SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  22.09.2000
Database last updated on 22.09.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip22.09.2000Change - withdrawalpublished on 08.11.2000 [2000/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nielsen Media Research, Inc.
299 Park Avenue New York
New York 10171-0074 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/36]For all designated states
Nielsen Media Research, Inc.
299 Park Avenue
New York, New York 10171-0074 / US
Inventor(s)01 / LU, Daozheng
1903 Dunloe Circle
Dunedin, FL 34698 / US
02 / HARKNESS, David, H.
17 Heatherstone Lane
Wilton, CT 06897 / US
03 / PRICE, Gordon, R.
P.O. Box 46413
Pass-A-Grille Beach, FL 33741-6413 / US
[2000/36]
Representative(s)Lawrence, John , et al
Barker Brettell LLP
100 Hagley Road
Edgbaston
Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/36]Lawrence, John , et al
Barker Brettell 138 Hagley Road Edgbaston
Birmingham B16 9PW / GB
Application number, filing date98926519.409.06.1998
[2000/36]
WO1998US12034
Priority number, dateUS1997097469920.11.1997         Original published format: US 974699
[2000/36]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9927668
Date:03.06.1999
Language:EN
[1999/22]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1032998
Date:06.09.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.06.1999
[2000/36]
Search report(s)International search reportEP03.06.1999
ClassificationInternational:H04H9/00
[2000/36]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI [2000/36]
TitleGerman:SPRACHERKENNUNGS-EINHEIT FÜR EIN ZUHÖRER-BESTIMMUNGS-SYSTEM(16.06.99)[2000/36]
English:VOICE RECOGNITION UNIT FOR AUDIENCE MEASUREMENT SYSTEM[2000/36]
French:UNITE DE RECONNAISSANCE VOCALE POUR SYSTEME DE MESURE D'AUDIENCE[2000/36]
Entry into regional phase08.06.2000National basic fee paid 
08.06.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
08.06.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.06.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
08.06.2000Examination requested  [2000/36]
11.08.2000Application withdrawn by applicant  [2000/45]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[DYX]US4907079  (TURNER LESTER [US], et al) [DY] 1,26,47 * column 1, line 34 - line 49 * * column 3, line 13 - line 23 * * column 6, line 19 - line 26 * * column 7, line 30 - line 37 * * column 10, line 1 - line 25 * * idem * [X] 60;
 [Y]US5267323  (KIMURA TOSHIYUKI [JP]) [Y] 1 * abstract * * figures 4,5 *;
 [DY]US5481294  (THOMAS WILLIAM L [US], et al) [DY] 26 * abstract * * figure 1 *;
 [A]US5303299  (HUNT ALAN K [US], et al) [A] 17,40,53,65,70 * column 6, line 17 - line 60 *
 [Y]  - CHIBELUSHI C C ET AL, "Audio-visual person recognition: an evaluation of data fusion strategies", EUROPEAN CONFERENCE ON SECURITY AND DETECTION - ECOS97 INCORPORATING THE ONE DAY SYMPOSIUM ON TECHNOLOGY USED FOR COMBATTING FRAUD (CONF. PUBL. NO.437), EUROPEAN CONFERENCE ON SECURITY AND DETECTION - ECOS97 INCORPORATING THE ONE DAY SYMPOSIUM ON TEC, ISBN 0-85296-683-0, 1997, London, UK, IEE, UK, pages 26 - 30, XP002077687 [Y] 47 * abstract * * figure 1 * * paragraph [02.2] *