Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0987958

EP0987958 - IMPROVED FISH FEED AND METHOD OF USING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  20.07.2007
Database last updated on 17.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip14.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 16.04.2008  [2008/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
THE UNIVERSITY OF BRITISH COLUMBIA
2075 Westbrook Mall Vancouver
British Columbia V6T 1Z1 / CA
[N/P]
Former [2000/13]For all designated states
THE UNIVERSITY OF BRITISH COLUMBIA
2075 Westbrook Mall
Vancouver, British Columbia V6T 1Z1 / CA
Inventor(s)01 / ANG, Keng, P.
86 Richmond Street
New Westminster, British Columbia V3L 5N / CA
02 / PETRELL, Royann, J.
R.R. 6, Site 650, C-32
Courtenay, British Columbia V9N 8H9 / CA
03 / MARCH, Beryl
5808 Wallace Street
Vancouver, British Columbia V6N 2A4 / CA
[2000/13]
Representative(s)Sexton, Jane Helen
J A Kemp
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/13]Sexton, Jane Helen
J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5LX / GB
Application number, filing date98928026.809.06.1998
[2000/13]
WO1998CA00565
Priority number, dateUS19970049229P09.06.1997         Original published format: US 49229 P
[2000/13]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9856261
Date:17.12.1998
Language:EN
[1998/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0987958
Date:29.03.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.12.1998
[2000/13]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0987958
Date:03.03.2004
Language:EN
[2004/10]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP17.12.1998
ClassificationInternational:A23K1/18, A23K1/16, A01K97/04
[2000/13]
Designated contracting statesDK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IE,   IT [2000/13]
TitleGerman:VERBESSERTES FISCHFUTTER UND VERFAHREN ZU DESSEN VERWENDUNG[2000/13]
English:IMPROVED FISH FEED AND METHOD OF USING SAME[2000/13]
French:NOURRITURE AMELIOREE POUR POISSONS ET SON MODE D'UTILISATION[2000/13]
Entry into regional phase07.01.2000National basic fee paid 
07.01.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
07.01.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.01.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
10.01.2000Examination requested  [2000/13]
14.06.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
22.12.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.06.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08)
12.04.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
18.06.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.08.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
12.02.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.05.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.11.2003Fee for grant paid
28.11.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  03.12.2004  21.12.2004  ADMISSIBLE
Cargill, Inc.
15407 McGinty Road West Wayzata
Minnesota, MN 55391-5624 / US
Opponent's representative
Knowles, James Atherton
Stevens Hewlett & Perkins
1 St Augustine's Place
Bristol BS1 4UD / GB
 [N/P]
Former [2005/27]
Opponent(s)01  03.12.2004  21.12.2004  ADMISSIBLE
Cargill, Inc.
15407 McGinty Road West
Wayzata Minnesota, MN 55391-5624 / US
Opponent's representative
Knowles, James Atherton
Stevens Hewlett & Perkins 1 St Augustine's Place
Bristol BS1 4UD / GB
Former [2005/05]
Opponent(s)01  03.12.2004  21.12.2004  ADMISSIBLE
Cargill, Inc.
15407 McGinty Road West
Wayzata Minnesota, MN 55391-5624 / US
Opponent's representative
Knowles, James Atherton (GB)
Stevens Hewlett & Perkins 1 St Augustine's Place
GB-Bristol BS1 4UD / GB
23.02.2005Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
04.01.2007Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 08.03.2007
04.01.2007Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
01.02.2007Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
11.02.2007Legal effect of revocation of patent [2007/34]
08.03.2007Date of oral proceedings
Request for further processing for:18.06.2002Request for further processing filed
18.06.2002Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
12.07.2002Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
13.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
26.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
12.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR03.03.2004
IT03.03.2004
DK03.06.2004
IE09.06.2004
ES14.06.2004
GB09.06.2006
[2008/16]
Former [2007/29]FR03.03.2004
DK03.06.2004
IE09.06.2004
ES14.06.2004
GB09.06.2006
Former [2006/14]FR03.03.2004
DK03.06.2004
IE09.06.2004
ES14.06.2004
Former [2005/46]DK03.06.2004
IE09.06.2004
ES14.06.2004
FR18.02.2005
Former [2005/24]DK03.06.2004
IE09.06.2004
ES14.06.2004
Former [2005/18]DK03.06.2004
ES14.06.2004
Former [2004/46]ES14.06.2004
Cited inInternational search[X]EP0330427  (FLOW RITE OF TENNESSEE INC A D [US]) [X] 1-27 * column 1, line 1 - column 2, line 34; claims 1-10 *;
 [X]US5415862  (BETHSHEARS WILLIAM D [US], et al) [X] 1-27 * column 1, line 45 - column 2, line 66 * * column 3, lines 51-62 * * column 5, line 51 - column 6, line 37 *;
 [X]JPS5651939  ;
 [A]WO9418932  (WHITTAKER CLARK & DANIELS INC [US], et al) [A] 1-5 * claims 1-6,27 *;
 [A]JPH03280841  ;
 [A]JPH07150071
 [X]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 81, no. 26, Database accession no. 81-46756D, XP002083205 & JPS5651939 A 19810509 (DENKI KAGAKU KOGYO KK) [X] 1 * abstract *
 [AD]  - BROWMAN H.I., MARCOTTE B.M., "Effects of prey color and background color on feeding by atlantic salmon alevins", THE PROGRESSIVE FISH-CULTURIST, (1987), vol. 49, page 140-143, XP002083203 [AD] 1-27 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1577/1548-8640(1987)49<140:EOPCAB>2.0.CO;2
 [AD]  - GINETZ R.M., LARKIN P.A., "Choice of colors of food items by rainbow trout (Salmo gairdneri)", JOURNAL FISHERIES RESEARCH BOARD OF CANADA, (1973), vol. 30, no. 2, page 229-234, XP002083204 [AD] 1-27 * the whole document *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920316), vol. 016, no. 106, Database accession no. (C - 0919), & JP03280841 A 19911211 (NIPPON SODA CO LTD) [A] 4,5,17 * abstract *
 [A]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 95, no. 32, Database accession no. 95-243802, XP002083206 & JPH07150071 A 19950613 (MERCK JAPAN KK) [A] 4,5 * abstract *