Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0976298

EP0976298 - METHOD FOR SUBSCRIBER INFORMATION TRANSFER IN A LOCAL LINE DISTRIBUTION NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  20.02.2004
Database last updated on 19.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip20.02.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 07.04.2004  [2004/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1
DE-80333 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/05]For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / GREMMELMAIER, Ulrich
Kerschensteiner Strasse 140
D-82110 Germering / DE
02 / HUBER, Manfred
Mitterweg 13 B
D-82152 Krailling / DE
03 / VON DER STRATEN, Gernot
Zugspitzstrasse 7
D-82327 Tutzing / DE
[2000/05]
Application number, filing date98928063.124.03.1998
[2000/05]
WO1998DE00867
Priority number, dateDE199711642918.04.1997         Original published format: DE 19716429
[2000/05]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9848590
Date:29.10.1998
Language:DE
[1998/43]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0976298
Date:02.02.2000
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.10.1998
[2000/05]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP29.10.1998
ClassificationInternational:H04Q11/04, H04L12/64
[2000/05]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2000/05]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR TEILNEHMERSEITIGEN INFORMATIONSÜBERTRAGUNG IN EINEM ANSCHLUSSLEITUNGSNETZ[2000/05]
English:METHOD FOR SUBSCRIBER INFORMATION TRANSFER IN A LOCAL LINE DISTRIBUTION NETWORK[2000/05]
French:PROCEDE DE TRANSMISSION D'INFORMATIONS COTE ABONNE DANS UN RESEAU DE BRANCHEMENTS LOCAUX[2000/05]
Entry into regional phase05.10.1999National basic fee paid 
05.10.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
05.10.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure01.09.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
05.10.1999Examination requested  [2000/05]
01.10.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/15]
04.11.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2004/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
19.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
18.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.200306   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[A]US5229992  (JURKEVICH MARK [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 5, line 61 - column 6, line 35 * * figures 5,8,9; claims 1-5 *
 [DY]  - HUBER M N ET AL, "MODELLING OF A MULTI-QUEUE POLLING SYSTEM WITH ARBITRARY SERVER INTERRUPTS FOR THE IDLE-SLOT-CONCATENATION PACKET SWITCHING PRINCIPLE IN A HYBRID CS/PS NODE", PROCEEDINGS OF THE TWELFTH INTERNATIONAL TELETRAFFIC CONGRESS (ITC-12), TORINO, (19880601), vol. 1, pages 521 - 528, XP000279785 [DY] 1,4-8 * pages 521-522, paragraphs 1-2.2 * * figures 1,2 *
 [YA]  - MORITA S ET AL, ""ELASTIC BASKET SWITCHING" APPLICATION TO DISTRIBUTED PBX", ICC '87, SEATTLE, (19870607), vol. 2 OF 3, pages 789 - 793, XP002063261 [Y] 1,4-8 * pages 789-790, paragraph 2 * * figure 1 * [A] 2,3
 [A]  - SLATTER R C ET AL, "CUSTOMER ACCESS TO INTEGRATED SERVICES DIGITAL NETWORKS", ELECTRICAL COMMUNICATION, (1981), vol. 56, no. 1, pages 31 - 43, XP002053606 [A] 1,4,5 * page 39, column L, line 44 - page 40, column L, line 11 * * figure 5 *
 [A]  - GERKE P R, "THE INTEGRATED SERVICES DIGITAL NETWORK (ISDN) AS A BASIS FOR COMBINED TELECOMMUNICATION", FROM ELECTRONICS TO MICROELECTRONICS (EUROCON '80), 4TH CONFERENCE, STUTTGART, (19800324), pages 233 - 236, XP002037606 [A] 1 * page 235, column L, lines 29-36 * * figure 2B *