Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0970396

EP0970396 - FIBER-INTEGRATED PHOTON CRYSTALS AND SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  29.07.2005
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip14.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): PT
published on 16.04.2008  [2008/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Deutsche Telekom AG
Friedrich-Ebert-Allee 140
53113 Bonn / DE
For all designated states
OFT Associates
77 Daventry Hill Road
Avon, CT 06001 / US
[2000/02]
Inventor(s)01 / MELTZ, Gerald
77 Daventry Hill Road
Avon, CT 06001 / US
02 / KOOPS, Hans, W., P.
Ernst-Ludwig-Strasse 16
D-64372 Ober-Ramstadt / DE
[2000/02]
Representative(s)Gornott, Dietmar
Katscher Habermann
Patentanwälte
Dolivostrasse 15A
64293 Darmstadt / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/02]Gornott, Dietmar, Dipl.-Ing.
Zilleweg 29
64291 Darmstadt / DE
Application number, filing date98928091.226.03.1998
[2000/02]
WO1998DE00905
Priority number, dateDE199711337129.03.1997         Original published format: DE 19713371
[2000/02]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9844367
Date:08.10.1998
Language:DE
[1998/40]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0970396
Date:12.01.2000
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.10.1998
[2000/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0970396
Date:22.09.2004
Language:DE
[2004/39]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP08.10.1998
ClassificationInternational:G02B6/10
[2000/02]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/02]
TitleGerman:FASER-INTEGRIERTE PHOTONENKRISTALLE UND -SYSTEME[2000/02]
English:FIBER-INTEGRATED PHOTON CRYSTALS AND SYSTEMS[2000/02]
French:SYSTEMES ET CRISTAUX PHOTONIQUES INTEGRES A UNE FIBRE[2000/02]
Entry into regional phase29.10.1999National basic fee paid 
29.10.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
29.10.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.10.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
29.10.1999Examination requested  [2000/02]
12.03.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.07.2004Fee for grant paid
22.07.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)23.06.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/37]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
02.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
02.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
31.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
31.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI22.09.2004
IE22.09.2004
NL22.09.2004
DK22.12.2004
GR22.12.2004
SE22.12.2004
ES02.01.2005
PT22.02.2005
LU26.03.2005
BE31.03.2005
CH31.03.2005
LI31.03.2005
MC31.03.2005
[2008/16]
Former [2007/26]FI22.09.2004
IE22.09.2004
NL22.09.2004
DK22.12.2004
GR22.12.2004
SE22.12.2004
ES02.01.2005
LU26.03.2005
BE31.03.2005
CH31.03.2005
LI31.03.2005
MC31.03.2005
Former [2007/17]FI22.09.2004
IE22.09.2004
NL22.09.2004
DK22.12.2004
GR22.12.2004
SE22.12.2004
ES02.01.2005
BE31.03.2005
CH31.03.2005
LI31.03.2005
LU31.03.2005
MC31.03.2005
Former [2006/14]FI22.09.2004
IE22.09.2004
NL22.09.2004
DK22.12.2004
GR22.12.2004
SE22.12.2004
ES02.01.2005
BE31.03.2005
CH31.03.2005
LI31.03.2005
MC31.03.2005
Former [2006/13]FI22.09.2004
IE22.09.2004
NL22.09.2004
DK22.12.2004
GR22.12.2004
SE22.12.2004
ES02.01.2005
BE31.03.2005
Former [2005/46]FI22.09.2004
IE22.09.2004
DK22.12.2004
GR22.12.2004
SE22.12.2004
ES02.01.2005
Former [2005/27]FI22.09.2004
IE22.09.2004
GR22.12.2004
SE22.12.2004
ES02.01.2005
Former [2005/24]FI22.09.2004
IE22.09.2004
GR22.12.2004
SE22.12.2004
Former [2005/18]FI22.09.2004
GR22.12.2004
SE22.12.2004
Former [2005/11]FI22.09.2004
SE22.12.2004
Former [2005/10]SE22.12.2004
Cited inInternational search[XD]  - KOOPS H W P, "PHOTONIC CRYSTALS BUILT BY THREE-DIMENSIONAL ADDITIVE LITHOGRAPHY ENABLE INTEGRATED OPTICS OF HIGH DENSITY", PROCEEDINGS OF THE SPIE, (19960805), vol. 2849, pages 248 - 256, XP000617864 [XD] 1-14 * abstract * * page 251 - page 255 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.255483
 [A]  - KNIGHT J C ET AL, "ALL-SILICA SINGLE-MODE OPTICAL FIBER WITH PHOTONIC CRYSTAL CLADDING", OPTICS LETTERS, (19961001), vol. 21, no. 19, pages 1547 - 1549, XP000630414 [A] 1,16 * the whole document *
 [A]  - KRAUSS T F ET AL, "OPTICAL CHARACTERIZATION OF WAVEGUIDE BASED PHOTONIC MICROSTRUCTURES", APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS, (19960318), vol. 68, no. 12, pages 1613 - 1615, XP000582346 [A] 1 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.115668