Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0972124

EP0972124 - MODULAR BOLT WITH A HANDLE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.08.2003
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip08.08.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 24.09.2003  [2003/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
EMKA BESCHLAGTEILE GmbH & Co. KG
Langenberger Strasse 32
D-42551 Velbert / DE
[2000/03]
Inventor(s)01 / SAUERLAND, Manfred
Pützstrasse 4
D-45144 Essen / DE
[2000/03]
Representative(s)Müller, Karl-Ernst , et al
Patentanwälte
Becker & Müller
Turmstrasse 22
40878 Ratingen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/03]Müller, Karl-Ernst, Dr., Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Patentanwälte Becker & Müller, Turmstrasse 22
40878 Ratingen / DE
Application number, filing date98928131.602.04.1998
[2000/03]
WO1998DE00955
Priority number, dateDE199711351802.04.1997         Original published format: DE 19713518
[2000/03]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9844223
Date:08.10.1998
Language:DE
[1998/40]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0972124
Date:19.01.2000
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.10.1998
[2000/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0972124
Date:02.10.2002
Language:DE
[2002/40]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP08.10.1998
ClassificationInternational:E05B13/00, E05C9/04
[2000/03]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [2000/03]
TitleGerman:MODULARER STANGENVERSCHLUSS[2000/03]
English:MODULAR BOLT WITH A HANDLE[2000/03]
French:PENE MODULAIRE[2000/03]
Entry into regional phase30.09.1999National basic fee paid 
30.09.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
30.09.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.10.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
30.09.1999Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
30.09.1999Examination requested  [2000/03]
10.04.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
29.04.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.07.2002Fee for grant paid
06.07.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)03.07.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/39]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
07.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
08.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[PX]DE29705778U  (EMKA BESCHLAGTEILE [DE]) [PX] 1-7 * the whole document *;
 [A]FR2582711  (MASSARD JEAN ETS [FR]) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0155543  (LOH KG RITTAL WERK [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO9415049  (RAMSAUER DIETER [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [DA]EP0261267  (RAMSAUER DIETER) [DA] 1 * the whole document *
by applicantEP0261267