Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0991439

EP0991439 - SUBCUTANEOUS INFUSION SET [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  28.10.2005
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip14.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): PT
published on 16.04.2008  [2008/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Unomedical A/S
Engmosen 1
3540 Lynge / DK
[N/P]
Former [2004/26]For all designated states
Unomedical a/s
Engmosen 1
3540 Lynge / DK
Former [2000/15]For all designated states
MAERSK MEDICAL A/S
Engmosen 1
3540 Lynge / DK
Inventor(s)01 / LARSEN, Bjorn, Gullak
Aholmvej 2
DK-4000 Roskilde / DK
02 / MATHIASEN, Orla
Aholmvej 2
DK-4000 Roskilde / DK
03 / FREDERIKSEN, Lars, Bjarne
Aholmvej 2
DK-4000 Roskilde / DK
04 / DELZAC, Marc
Aholmvej 2
DK-4000 Roskilde / DK
05 / TEISSEN-SIMONY, Claude
Ved Grensen 19
DK-2000 Frederiksberg / DK
 [2004/52]
Former [2000/15]01 / LARSEN, Bj rn, Gullak
holmvej 2
DK-4000 Roskilde / DK
02 / MATHIASEN, Orla
holmvej 2
DK-4000 Roskilde / DK
03 / FREDERIKSEN, Lars, Bjarne
holmvej 2
DK-4000 Roskilde / DK
04 / DELZAC, Marc
holmvej 2
DK-4000 Roskilde / DK
05 / TEISSEN-SIMONY, Claude
Ved Grensen 19
DK-2000 Frederiksberg / DK
Representative(s)Sundien, Thomas , et al
Zacco Denmark A/S
Hans Bekkevolds Allé 7
2900 Hellerup / DK
[N/P]
Former [2000/15]Sundien, Thomas , et al
Hofman-Bang A/S, Hans Bekkevolds Allé 7
2900 Hellerup / DK
Application number, filing date98928175.319.06.1998
[2000/15]
WO1998DK00262
Priority number, dateUS1997087952520.06.1997         Original published format: US 879525
[2000/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9858693
Date:30.12.1998
Language:EN
[1998/52]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0991439
Date:12.04.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.12.1998
[2000/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0991439
Date:22.12.2004
Language:EN
[2004/52]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE30.12.1998
ClassificationInternational:A61M5/00
[2000/15]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/15]
TitleGerman:SUBKUTANINFUSIONSVORRICHTUNG[2000/15]
English:SUBCUTANEOUS INFUSION SET[2000/15]
French:APPAREIL DE PERFUSION SOUS-CUTANEE[2000/15]
Entry into regional phase23.12.1999National basic fee paid 
23.12.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
23.12.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.01.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
23.12.1999Examination requested  [2000/15]
13.02.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
21.08.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.10.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
21.04.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.06.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.10.2004Fee for grant paid
19.10.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)23.09.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/50]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
11.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
14.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
12.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
14.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipPT22.05.2005
CY19.06.2005
LU19.06.2005
MC30.06.2005
[2008/16]
Former [2007/26]CY19.06.2005
LU19.06.2005
MC30.06.2005
Former [2007/21]CY19.06.2005
LU30.06.2005
MC30.06.2005
Former [2007/17]LU30.06.2005
MC30.06.2005
Former [2006/28]MC30.06.2005
Cited inInternational search[A]US5176662  (BARTHOLOMEW GERALD [US], et al);
 [A]EP0239244  (PACESETTER INFUSION LTD [US]);
 [A]US5545143  (FISCHELL DAVID R [US], et al)