Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1002064

EP1002064 - A MODIFIED POLYPEPTIDE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.08.2008
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip09.04.2010Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): FI
published on 12.05.2010  [2010/19]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Novozymes A/S
Krogsho̸jvej 36
2880 Bagsvaerd / DK
[N/P]
Former [2001/04]For all designated states
Novozymes A/S
Krogshoejvej 36
2880 Bagsvaerd / DK
Former [2000/21]For all designated states
NOVO NORDISK A/S
Novo Allé
2880 Bagsvaerd / DK
Inventor(s)01 / OLSEN, Arne, Agerlin
Novo Nordisk a/s Novo Allé
DK-2880 Bagsvaerd / DK
02 / FATUM, Tine, Muxoll
Novo Nordisk a/s Novo Allé
DK-2880 Bagsvaerd / DK
03 / DEUSSEN, Heinz-Josef
Novo Nordisk a/s Novo Allé
DK-2880 Bagsvaerd / DK
04 / ROGGEN, Erwin, Ludo
Novo Nordisk A/S Novo Allé
DK-2880 Bagsvaerd / DK
[2000/21]
Application number, filing date98928182.922.06.1998
[2000/21]
WO1998DK00270
Priority number, dateDK1997000075325.06.1997         Original published format: DK 75397
[2007/17]
Former [2000/21]DK1997000075325.06.1997
US19970051830P07.07.1997
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9900489
Date:07.01.1999
Language:EN
[1999/01]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1002064
Date:24.05.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.01.1999
[2000/21]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1002064
Date:10.10.2007
Language:EN
[2007/41]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE07.01.1999
ClassificationInternational:C12N9/96, C11D3/386, C07K17/08
[2007/20]
Former International [2000/21]C12N9/96, A61K7/48, C11D3/386, C07K17/08
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/21]
TitleGerman:MODIFIZIERTES POLYPEPTID[2006/40]
English:A MODIFIED POLYPEPTIDE[2000/21]
French:POLYPEPTIDE MODIFIE[2000/21]
Former [2000/21]MODIFIZIERTES POLYPEPTID.
Entry into regional phase25.01.2000National basic fee paid 
25.01.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
25.01.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.01.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
25.01.2000Examination requested  [2000/21]
20.02.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.06.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.03.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.06.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.04.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.08.2007Fee for grant paid
23.08.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)11.07.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2008/38]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
02.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
01.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
30.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
30.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
30.06.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
30.06.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
02.07.2007Renewal fee patent year 10
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT10.10.2007
CH10.10.2007
FI10.10.2007
LI10.10.2007
SE10.01.2008
GR11.01.2008
PT10.03.2008
DK09.06.2008
GB22.06.2008
IT22.06.2008
ES23.06.2008
IE23.06.2008
FR30.06.2008
[2010/19]
Former [2010/05]AT10.10.2007
CH10.10.2007
LI10.10.2007
SE10.01.2008
GR11.01.2008
PT10.03.2008
DK09.06.2008
GB22.06.2008
IT22.06.2008
ES23.06.2008
IE23.06.2008
FR30.06.2008
Former [2009/30]AT10.10.2007
CH10.10.2007
LI10.10.2007
SE10.01.2008
GR11.01.2008
PT10.03.2008
DK09.06.2008
GB22.06.2008
IE23.06.2008
Former [2009/13]AT10.10.2007
CH10.10.2007
LI10.10.2007
SE10.01.2008
GR11.01.2008
PT10.03.2008
DK09.06.2008
Former [2009/08]AT10.10.2007
CH10.10.2007
LI10.10.2007
SE10.01.2008
PT10.03.2008
DK09.06.2008
Former [2008/29]AT10.10.2007
CH10.10.2007
LI10.10.2007
SE10.01.2008
PT10.03.2008
Former [2008/24]CH10.10.2007
LI10.10.2007
SE10.01.2008
PT10.03.2008
Former [2008/23]CH10.10.2007
LI10.10.2007
SE10.01.2008
Cited inInternational search[X]US4179337  (DAVIS FRANK F [US], et al);
 [X]US4640835  (SHIMIZU KIMIHIRO [JP], et al);
 [X]WO9617929  (NOVO NORDISK AS [DK], et al);
 [X]US3910825  (HUPER FRITZ, et al);
 [X]EP0256127  (SHOWA DENKO KK [JP])
Examination   - SAVOLAINEN ET AL, "IgE-, IgA- and IgG-antibody responses to carbohydrate and protein antigens of Candida albicans in asthmatic children", ALLERGY, (1990), vol. 45, pages 54 - 63