Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1015261

EP1015261 - TYRE TREAD PATTERN AND MOULD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.07.2003
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip08.04.2005Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): FI
published on 25.05.2005  [2005/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Compagnie Générale des Etablissements MICHELIN-MICHELIN & CIE
12, Cours Sablon
63040 Clermont-Ferrand Cedex 09 / FR
[N/P]
Former [2000/27]For all designated states
Compagnie Générale des Etablissements MICHELIN-MICHELIN & CIE
12, Cours Sablon
63040 Clermont-Ferrand Cedex 09 / FR
Inventor(s)01 / LAGNIER, Alain
3, impasse des Tilleuls
F-63540 Romagnat / FR
02 / CHANET, Jean-Luc
10, rue du Onze-Novembre
F-63670 Le Cendre / FR
03 / LAVIALLE, Georges
2 bis, rue Georges Clémenceau
F-63160 Billom / FR
[2000/27]
Representative(s)Diernaz, Christian
Manufacture Française des
Pneumatiques Michelin
CBS/CORP/J/PI - F35 - Ladoux
23, place des Carmes-Déchaux
63040 Clermont-Ferrand Cedex 9 / FR
[N/P]
Former [2000/27]Diernaz, Christian
Michelin & Cie Service SGD/LG/PI-LAD
63040 Clermont-Ferrand Cedex 09 / FR
Application number, filing date98928298.320.05.1998
[2000/27]
WO1998EP02960
Priority number, dateFR1997000676630.05.1997         Original published format: FR 9706766
[2000/27]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9854009
Date:03.12.1998
Language:FR
[1998/48]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1015261
Date:05.07.2000
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.12.1998
[2000/27]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1015261
Date:11.09.2002
Language:FR
[2002/37]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP03.12.1998
ClassificationInternational:B60C11/12, B60C11/11, B29C33/42
[2000/27]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   FI,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   SE [2000/27]
TitleGerman:LAUFSTREIFENPROFIL UND -HERSTELLUNGSFORM FÜR LUFTREIFEN[2001/26]
English:TYRE TREAD PATTERN AND MOULD[2000/27]
French:SCULPTURE ET MOULE POUR BANDE DE ROULEMENT DE PNEUMATIQUE[2000/27]
Former [2000/27]VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR AUTOMATISCHEN HERSTELLUNG VON SCHNITTBILDERN
Entry into regional phase30.12.1999National basic fee paid 
30.12.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
30.12.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.11.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
30.12.1999Examination requested  [2000/27]
15.06.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
26.09.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.01.2002Fee for grant paid
07.01.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)12.06.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/36]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
31.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
31.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT11.09.2002
FI11.09.2002
BE31.05.2003
CH31.05.2003
LI31.05.2003
[2005/21]
Former [2004/28]AT11.09.2002
BE31.05.2003
CH31.05.2003
LI31.05.2003
Former [2004/22]AT11.09.2002
CH31.05.2003
LI31.05.2003
Former [2003/31]AT11.09.2002
Cited inInternational search[A]EP0540340  (BRIDGESTONE CORP [JP]) [A] 1-3 * figures 1-5 *;
 [A]JPH03153406  ;
 [A]DE2024279  (VEB REIFENKOMBINAT) [A] 1,3 * the whole document *;
 [A]GB474588  (US RUBBER PROD INC) [A] 1,3,7 * figures 1-3 * * page 2, line 34 - line 41 *;
 [A]JPH02246810  ;
 [DA]EP0378090  (MICHELIN & CIE [FR]) [DA] 5 * figures 1,2 *;
 [A]JPH07215015  ;
 [DA]US1733064  (LAMBERT EXECUTRIX HELEN H) [DA] 7,14 * page 1, line 77 - line 80; figure 9 * * page 2, line 22 - line 42; figures 2-7 *;
 [A]GB242870  (HENRY MILLER LAMBERT) [A] 7 * the whole document *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910926), vol. 015, no. 381, Database accession no. (M - 1162), [A] 1-3 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19901219), vol. 014, no. 572, Database accession no. (M - 1061), [A] 4 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19951226), vol. 095, no. 011, [A] 1,3 * abstract *