Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0988572

EP0988572 - OPTICAL SYSTEM HAVING AN UNLIMITED DEPTH OF FOCUS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.03.2002
Database last updated on 22.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.03.2002No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 08.05.2002  [2002/19]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Letcher, Frank Scott
3416 S. Florance Street
Tulsa, OK 74105 / US
For all designated states
Tigliev, George Samuilovich
Prospect Blyukhera, House 55, Apartment 190
St. Petersburg, 191104 / RU
[2000/45]
Former [2000/13]For all designated states
Carter, Gerald
27 Imperial Square
Cheltenham, Gloucestershire GL50 1RQ / GB
For all designated states
Letcher, Frank Scott
3416 S. Florance Street
Tulsa, OK 74105 / US
For all designated states
Tigliev, George Samuilovich
Prospect Blyukhera, House 55, Apartment 190
St. Petersburg, 191104 / RU
Inventor(s)01 / LETCHER, Frank, Scott
3416 S. Florence Street
Tulsa, OK 74105 / US
02 / TIGLIEV, George Samuilovich
Prospect Blyukhera House 55, Apartment 190
St.Petersburg, 191104 / RU
[2000/13]
Representative(s)Carter, Gerald , et al
Arthur R. Davies & Co. 27 Imperial Square
Cheltenham, Gloucestershire GL50 1RQ / GB
[2000/13]
Application number, filing date98928438.509.06.1998
[2000/13]
WO1998GB01685
Priority number, dateUS1997087608813.06.1997         Original published format: US 876088
[2000/13]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9857211
Date:17.12.1998
Language:EN
[1998/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0988572
Date:29.03.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.12.1998
[2000/13]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0988572
Date:16.05.2001
Language:EN
[2001/20]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP17.12.1998
ClassificationInternational:G02B21/24
[2000/13]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   LI [2000/13]
TitleGerman:OPTISCHES SYSTEM MIT UNBESCHRAENKTER SCHAERFENTIEFE[2000/13]
English:OPTICAL SYSTEM HAVING AN UNLIMITED DEPTH OF FOCUS[2000/13]
French:SYSTEME OPTIQUE A DISTANCE FOCALE ILLIMITEE[2000/13]
Entry into regional phase11.01.2000National basic fee paid 
11.01.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
11.01.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.01.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
11.01.2000Examination requested  [2000/13]
31.08.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
10.11.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.12.2000Fee for grant paid
22.12.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)19.02.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/19]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[DA]US5351152  (KUO PAO-KUANG [US], et al) [DA] 1-23 * column 6, line 55 - column 10, line 38; figures 3-8 *;
 [A]US4521108  (HORIKAWA YOSHIAKI [JP]) [A] 1,8,14,17,21,22 * column 3, line 61 - column 6, line 68; figures 2,6-14 *;
 [A]US5434703  (MORIZUMI MASAAKI [JP]) [A] 1-5,8-11,14,17,18,21 * column 5, line 44 - column 12, line 15; figures 1-7 *;
 [DA]US5054896  (MARGOLIS H JAY [US]) [DA] 1-5,8,14,17,21,22 * column 6, line 56 - column 8, line 29; figure 2 *